EP1625402 - DETECTION, CHARACTERIZATION AND TREATMENT OF VIRAL INFECTION AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canadian Blood Services 1800 Alta Vista Drive Ottawa, Ontario K1G 4J5 / CA | [2014/01] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Canadian Blood Services 1800 Alta Vista Drive Ottawa Ontario K1G 4J5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Yu-Wen 79F Glen Park Drive Ottawa, Ontario K1B 3Z1 / CA | 02 /
BROWN, Earl 71 Sunnycrest Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2E 5Y6 / CA | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/07] | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04726942.8 | 13.04.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004CA00544 | Priority number, date | US20030461137P | 09.04.2003 Original published format: US 461137 P | US20030506779P | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 506779 P | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090544 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1625402 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625402 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
C07K16/109 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/703 (EP,US);
C12Q1/706 (EP,US);
C12Q1/708 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS, ZU DER BESTIMMUNG UND ZU DER BEHANDLUNG VON VIRALINFEKTIONEN | [2013/31] | English: | DETECTION, CHARACTERIZATION AND TREATMENT OF VIRAL INFECTION AND METHODS THEREOF | [2006/07] | French: | DETECTION, CARACTERISATION ET TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS VIRALES, ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2006/07] |
Former [2006/07] | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEISS, ZU DER BESTIMMUNG UND ZU DER BEHANDLUNG VON VIRALINFEKTIONEN | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 24.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2004 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | ES | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IE | 13.04.2014 | LU | 13.04.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.04.2004 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.04.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 13.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.04.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.04.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.04.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.04.2014 | ||
LU | 13.04.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 13.04.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [YD] - BECK, S. AND BARRELL, B.G., "Human cytomegalovirus encodes a glycoprotein homologous to MHC class-I-antigens", NATURE, (19880121), vol. 331, pages 269 - 272, XP001183297 [YD] 1-12,44-77,89-96,128-131,145-149,153-164 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/331269a0 | [X] - BARNETT, L.A. ET AL, "Molecular mimicry: a mechanism for autoimmune injury", FASEB, (1992), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 840 - 844, XP009036267 [X] 1-12,44-77,89-96,128-131,145-149,153-164 * the whole document * | [X] - OLESZAK, E. L., "Molecular mimicry between Fc receptors and viral antigens", ARCHIVUM IMMUNOLOGIAE ET THERAPIAE EXPERIMENTALE, (1994), vol. 42, pages 83 - 88, XP009036920 [X] 1-12,44-77,89-96,128-131,145-149,153-164 * the whole document * | [DY] - KATO N ET AL, "GENETIC DRIFT IN HYPERVARIABLE REGION 1 OF THE VIRAL GENOME IN PERSISTENT HEPATITIS C VIRUS INFECTION", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199408), vol. 68, no. 8, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4776 - 4784, XP001120895 [DY] 1-12,44-77,89-96,128-131,145-149,153-164 * the whole document * | [XD] - ZHAO, Z. S. ET AL, "Molecular mimicry by Herpex simplex virus-Type-1: autoimmune disease after viral infection", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, pages 1344 - 1347, XP001183296 [XD] 1-12,44-77,89-96,128-131,145-149,153-164 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.279.5355.1344 | [X] - NATALE, C. ET AL, "Computer-assisted analysis of molecular mimicry between human papilloma virus 16 E7 oncoprotein and human protein sequences", IMMUNOLOGY AND CELL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 78, pages 580 - 585, XP002298030 [X] 1-12,44-77,89-96,128-131,145-149,153-164 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1440-1711.2000.00949.x | [PY] - OLESZAK EL ET AL, "Severe acute respiratory syndrome coronavirus and viral mimicry", THE LANCET, (20030614), vol. 361, page 2081, XP002298031 [PY] 1-12,44-77,89-96,128-131,145-149,153-164 * the whole document * |