EP1634344 - BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEALED CONTACT TERMINAL BUSHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARTA Automotive Systems GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30417 Hannover / DE | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECHTHOLD, Dieter Chattenweg 28 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | 02 /
PELZ, Kai Bohnstr.23 31832 Springe / DE | 03 /
JOSWIG, Ralf Ahornring 22 29690 Buchholz / DE | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Gerstein, Hans Joachim, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Hauss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Gerstein, Hans Joachim, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 04727219.0 | 14.04.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004DE00767 | Priority number, date | DE2003126906 | 14.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10326906 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004114436 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1634344 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634344 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/04, H01M2/06, H01M2/08 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B29C65/1635 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/147 (KR);
B29C66/532 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/1677 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/1683 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/1222 (EP,KR);
B29C66/1224 (EP,KR);
B29C66/12441 (EP,KR);
B29C66/24221 (EP,KR);
B29C66/61 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/172 (KR);
H01M50/176 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/183 (KR);
H01M50/529 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/553 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/564 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/7146 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4911 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49115 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKKUMULATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DICHTEN KONTAKTKLEMMENDURCHFÜHRUNG | [2006/11] | English: | BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEALED CONTACT TERMINAL BUSHING | [2006/11] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN PASSAGE DE BORNE DE CONTACT ETANCHE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.06.2008 | CZ | 04.06.2008 | DK | 04.06.2008 | EE | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | IE | 04.06.2008 | IT | 04.06.2008 | NL | 04.06.2008 | PL | 04.06.2008 | RO | 04.06.2008 | SI | 04.06.2008 | SK | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | ES | 15.09.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | HU | 05.12.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
GR | 05.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
IT | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
NL | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
ES | 15.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 04.06.2008 | |
ES | 15.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB2026761 (HOPPECKE ZOELLNER SOHN ACCU) [DA] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US5893959 (MUELLICH VITUS [DE]) [A] 4,5,9,10 * claims 1,4-6 *; | [DA]DE19916786 (KTD PLASTICON KUNSTSTOFFTECHNI [DE]) [DA] 4,9 * claims 1,4 *; | [X]US2001023038 (LIGEOIS DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-11 * figures 1-8; claims 1-18 *; | [A]WO02055287 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]US6444946 (KORTE JOERN [DE]) [A] 1,8 * claims 1-20 * |