EP1627470 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT COMPRISING AN ENERGY SAVING MODE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMMEL, Berndt, M. Dr. Brenner-Str. 16 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | 02 /
KÜNEMUND, Thomas Strassbergerstr. 73 80809 München / DE | [2007/03] |
Former [2006/08] | 01 /
GAMMEL, Berndt, M. Dr. Brenner-Str. 16 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | ||
02 /
KÜNEMUND, Thomas Lindwurmstr. 129c 80337 München / DE | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04727231.5 | 14.04.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004DE00768 | Priority number, date | DE2003123861 | 26.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10323861 | [2006/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109921 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627470 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627470 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/00 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
H03K19/0016 (EP,US);
H03K21/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/35] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG MIT STROMSPARMODUS UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DER INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNG | [2006/08] | English: | INTEGRATED CIRCUIT COMPRISING AN ENERGY SAVING MODE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID CIRCUIT | [2006/08] | French: | CIRCUIT INTEGRE POUVANT FONCTIONNER EN MODE ECONOMIE DE COURANT, ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER CE CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002186040 (OOISHI TSUKASA [JP]) [X] 1-4,12-14,16 * paragraphs [0062] - [0066] - [0078] , [0093] - [0095] - [0103] - [0106] - [0178]; figures 1,2,4,5,6A,6B,7,27 *; | [X]EP0964519 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,12-14,16 * paragraphs [0067] - [0105]; figures 2,3A-3E *; | [X]EP0993116 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,16 * paragraphs [0056] - [0110]; figures 3,4,5A-5G,6A-6G *; | [A]US2002105845 (HIDAKA HIDETO [JP]) [A] 1,16 * figures 2-6,16,19-21 *; | [A]US2002060947 (HATAE HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,16 * figures 1,4,5 * | [X] - SHIGEMATSU S ET AL, "A 1-V HIGH-SPEED MTCMOS CIRCUIT SCHEME FOR POWER-DOWN APPLICATION CIRCUITS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970601), vol. 32, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 861 - 869, XP000723409 [X] 1-3,16 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.585288 |