EP1621047 - AUDIO SIGNAL GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUIJERS, Erik, G., P. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KLEIN MIDDELINK, Marc, W., T. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DE KERKHOF, Leon, M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/02] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/05] | Slenders, Petrus J. W. Philips Intellectual Property and Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04727354.5 | 14.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004IB50432 | Priority number, date | EP20030076134 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03076134 | EP20030076280 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03076280 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004093494 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621047 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621047 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04S5/00, G10L19/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
G10L19/00 (EP,BR,US);
H04S5/00 (BR,KR);
H04S1/00 (KR);
H04S1/007 (EP,BR,US);
H04S2420/03 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOSIGNALGENERIERUNG | [2006/05] | English: | AUDIO SIGNAL GENERATION | [2006/05] | French: | CREATION DE SIGNAUX AUDIO | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.04.2007 | CY | 11.04.2007 | CZ | 11.04.2007 | DK | 11.04.2007 | EE | 11.04.2007 | FI | 11.04.2007 | NL | 11.04.2007 | RO | 11.04.2007 | SI | 11.04.2007 | SK | 11.04.2007 | LU | 14.04.2007 | IE | 16.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | BG | 11.07.2007 | SE | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.07.2007 | PT | 11.09.2007 | HU | 12.10.2007 | [2016/07] |
Former [2009/44] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
TR | 11.04.2007 | ||
LU | 14.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
HU | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
LU | 14.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
HU | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 11.04.2007 | |
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 11.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3992582 (OSAKABE YOSHIO) [X] 1-3,7,17,18 * column 3, line 3 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [XA]US4039755 (BERKOVITZ ROBERT A) [X] 1-7,10-12,17,18 * abstract * [A] 8,9,13-16; | [A]US4308424 (BICE JR ROBERT G) [A] 1,13-18 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP0843503 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,13-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - line 35 ** column 2, line 3 - line 44 *; | [A]EP1024679 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043]; figures 5,6 * |