EP1616088 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH INJECTION OF GASEOUS FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westport Research Inc. Suite 101 1750 West 75th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6P 6G2 / CA | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Westport Research Inc. 2nd Floor, 1700 West 75th Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6P 6G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILGER, Ulrich Eberhardstrasse 1 45279 Essen / DE | 02 /
BARTUNEK, Bernd Sandstrasse 72 40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
OVERSBY, Kevin, Kwame 784 East 57th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5X 1T2 / CA | 04 /
LOCKLEY, Ian, Hayden 302 - 3525 West Broadway Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 2B5 / CA | 05 /
CRAWFORD, John, Gordon 604 - 1320 Islington Avenue Etobicoke, Ontario M9A 5C6 / CA | 06 /
MANN, Kenneth, R., C. 305 - 3550 West Broadway Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 2B6 / CA | 07 /
WING, Richard 3505 West 40th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 3B7 / CA | [2006/15] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
HILGER, Ulrich Eberhardstrasse 1 45279 Essen / DE | ||
02 /
BARTUNEK, Bernd Sandstrasse 72 40789 Monheim / DE | |||
03 /
OVERSBY, Kevin, Kwame 784 East 57th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5X 1T2 / CA | |||
04 /
LOCKLEY, Ian, Hayden 302 - 3525 West Broadway Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 2B5 / CA | |||
05 /
CRAWFORD, John, Gordon 212 - 11671 Seventh Avenue Richmond, British Columbia V7E 4X2 / CA | |||
06 /
MANN, Kenneth, R., C. 305 - 3550 West Broadway Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 2B6 / CA | |||
07 /
WING, Richard 3505 West 40th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 3B7 / CA | |||
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
HILGER, Ulrich Siepenblick 7 45138 Essen / DE | ||
02 /
BARTUNEK, Bernd Ulmenweg 30 40789 Monheim / DE | |||
03 /
OVERSBY, Kevin, Kwame 784 East 57th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5X 1T2 / CA | |||
04 /
LOCKLEY, Ian, Hayden 302 - 3525 West Broadway Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 2B5 / CA | |||
05 /
CRAWFORD, John, Gordon 212 - 11671 Seventh Avenue Richmond, British Columbia V7E 4X2 / CA | |||
06 /
MANN, Kenneth, R., C. 305 - 3550 West Broadway Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 2B6 / CA | |||
07 /
WING, Richard 3505 West 40th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 3B7 / CA | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04727803.1 | 16.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004CA00573 | Priority number, date | US20030414850 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 414850 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004092556 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616088 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616088 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02B43/00, F02D19/02, F02M21/02, F02B23/06 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
F02B23/0657 (EP);
F02B23/0639 (EP);
F02B23/0669 (EP);
F02B23/0696 (EP);
F02B43/00 (EP);
F02D19/024 (EP);
F02M21/0269 (EP);
F02M21/0275 (EP);
F02M21/0281 (EP);
F02B2275/14 (EP);
F02B23/0621 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/30] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT GASEINSPRITZUNG | [2006/03] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH INJECTION OF GASEOUS FUEL | [2006/03] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A INJECTION DE COMBUSTIBLE GAZEUX | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2008/41] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/43] | IT | 23.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4462354 (KNOWLES RICHARD P [GB]) [A] 1,51 * figure 1 * * abstract ** claims 1-20 *; | [DA]US4721081 (KRAUJA ZIEDONIS I [US], et al) [DA] 1,51 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [DA]US5329908 (TARR YUL J [US], et al) [DA] 1,51 * figure 1 * [A] ; | [A]EP0667448 (CHERRY MARK ALAN [US]) [A] 1,16,18,51 * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * claims 1-22 *; | [A]US5676100 (DAM CHUONG Q [US], et al) [A] 1,51 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0233236 (GVH ENTWICKLUNGSGESELLSCHAFT F [DE], et al) [X] 1-88 * the whole document *; | US2004011323 [ ] (HILGER ULRICH [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4721081 | US5329908 |