EP1619555 - POROUS UNDERLAYER FILM FORMING COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR FORMING PHOTORESIST PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/04] | POROUS UNDERLAYER FILM AND UNDERLAYER FILM FORMING COMPOSITION USED FOR FORMING THE SAME | ||
[2011/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takei, S., c/o Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. ELectronic Mat. Res. Laboratories, 635, Sasakura Fuchu-machi, Toyama-shi, Toyama 9392753 / JP | 02 /
Sakaida, Y., c/o Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Electronic Mat. Res. Laboratories, 635, Sasakura Fuchu-machi, Toyama-shi, Toyama 9392753 / JP | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04727980.7 | 16.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004JP05446 | Priority number, date | JP20030112667 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003112667 | [2006/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004092840 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619555 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/11, H01L21/027 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
G03F7/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/30] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSERE UNTERSCHICHTFILM-BILDUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PHOTORESISTMUSTERS | [2011/35] | English: | POROUS UNDERLAYER FILM FORMING COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR FORMING PHOTORESIST PATTERN | [2011/35] | French: | COMPOSITION SERVANT A FORMER UN FILM SOUS-JACENT POREUX ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN MOTIF PHOTORESIST | [2011/35] |
Former [2006/04] | PORÖSER UNTERSCHICHTFILM UND UNTERSCHICHTFILM-BILDUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SEINE HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2006/04] | POROUS UNDERLAYER FILM AND UNDERLAYER FILM FORMING COMPOSITION USED FOR FORMING THE SAME | ||
Former [2006/04] | FILM SOUS-JACENT POREUX ET COMPOSITION FILMOGENE SERVANT A FORMER LEDIT FILM SOUS-JACENT | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2005 | Translation filed | 07.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001021726 (BROWN JAMES F [US]) [X] 4* page 7, paragraphs 71-78 * | International search | [X]JP2002207295 (JSR CORP); | [X]JP2002207296 (JSR CORP); | [Y]JP2003057828 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]JP2001272506 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP); | [A]JP2000512402 | by applicant | JP2002207295 | JP2002207296 | US2001021726 | US6114085 |