EP1619193 - SPIROPIPERIDINE COMPOUND AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZAWA, Rena, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 02 /
TAKAOKA, Yoshikazu c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 03 /
HABASHITA, Hiromu c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 04 /
SHIBAYAMA, Shiro c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 17-2, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 05 /
KOKUBO, Masaya, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04727985.6 | 16.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004JP05493 | Priority number, date | JP20030114188 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003114188 | [2006/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004092169 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | JA | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619193 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/10, A61K31/438, A61K31/527, A61K31/5513, A61K45/06, A61P1/04, A61P1/16, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P11/00, A61P11/02, A61P11/06, A61P13/12, A61P17/00, A61P17/04, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P25/00, A61P27/02, A61P29/00, A61P31/18 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
C07D471/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/438 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/04] | C07D471/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIROPIPERIDINVERBINDUNG UND DEREN MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2006/04] | English: | SPIROPIPERIDINE COMPOUND AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF | [2006/04] | French: | COMPOSE DE SPIROPIPERIDINE ET SON UTILISATION MEDICINALE | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2005 | Translation filed | 07.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 07.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/22] | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP10013312.3 / EP2364982 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5962462 (MILLS SANDER G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-19 * see all examples and their chemokine receptor antagonistic activity and especially examples 17, 169 and 170 * [Y] 1-6,10-19; | [X]US6291469 (FISHER MATTHEW J [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * see steps A of examples 20 and 21, steps B of examples 5, 26, 30 and 32 and step C of example 13 *; | [XY]JP2002348288 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO) [X] 1-6,10-19 * see the compounds of formula (I) wherein R1 is hydrogen and the rings AB are of formulas (c), (d), (e) on p. 13, (o) and (r) on p. 14, (u) on p. 15, and (ccc) on p. 17 which are equivalent to formulas (a) aqnd (bbb) and their chemokine receptor anatgonistic activity * [Y] 1-6,10-19; | [X]WO03024941 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-19 * see compounds 1-28, 1-29 on p. 69, 5-3 on p. 99 and especially 6-2 on p. 103 and their anti HIV activity *; | [X]JP2003104884 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * see the starting materials of formula III of the corresponding examples *; | [XP]EP1308439 (WELFIDE CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-3 * see the spiro-piperidine starting materials of examples 129 and 130 *; | [YP]EP1378510 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [YP] 1-6,10-19 * see compounds of formula I and chemokine antagonistic activity *; | [X] - PAUL W SMITH ET AL, "New Spiropiperidines as Potent and Selective Non-Peptide Tachykinin NK2 Receptor Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (19950101), vol. 38, no. 19, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3772 - 3779, XP009135475 [X] 1-6 * see deprotection (step c) of compound 13 in scheme 2, of compound 18 in scheme 3 (step e) and of compound 19 in scheme 4 (step b) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00019a006 | International search | [X]WO03020721 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO0206234 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JPH11512723 ; | [X]JPS4972332 ; | [X]JPS4913184 ; | [X]JPH0418092 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD); | [X]JP2003104884 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD); | [X]JPH08512034 ; | [X]JP2002348288 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [XP]WO03057698 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US]); | [A]WO02074770 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) |