EP1615454 - IMAGE FILE CREATION DEVICE AND IMAGE FILE REPRODUCTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-5-5, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0083 / JP | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-5-5, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0083 / JP | |||
For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIOI, Masahiro 2-24-7-A108, Honda-cho, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 266-0005 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Toshio 556-1-105 Tatemachi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 1930944 / JP | 03 /
HORIUCHI, Keiji 180 Omori, Anpachimachi, Anpachi-gun Gifu 5030116 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIKAWA, Takatoshi 1-19-11, Nagao-motomachi Hirakata-city Osaka 573-0163 / JP | 05 /
SEKIZAWA, Hidehiko, Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
SATOH, Seiji, Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2007/23] |
Former [2006/02] | 01 /
SHIOI, Masahiro 2-24-7-A108, Honda-cho, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 266-0005 / JP | ||
02 /
NOMURA, Toshio 556-1-105 Tatemachi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 1930944 / JP | |||
03 /
HORIUCHI, Keiji 180 Omori, Anpachimachi, Anpachi-gun Gifu 5030116 / JP | |||
04 /
YOSHIKAWA, Takatoshi 1-16-407 Arata-cho, Ogaki-shi Gifu 5030856 / JP | |||
05 /
SEKIZAWA, Hidehiko, Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
06 /
SATOH, Seiji, Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/02] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04728257.9 | 19.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004JP05537 | Priority number, date | JP20030112851 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003112851 | [2006/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004093468 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615454 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/30] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDDATEIERZEUGUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND BILDDATEIWIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG | [2006/02] | English: | IMAGE FILE CREATION DEVICE AND IMAGE FILE REPRODUCTION DEVICE | [2006/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CREATION D'UN FICHIER IMAGE, ET DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION D'UN FICHIER IMAGE | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2005 | Translation filed | 26.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11127369 (CANON KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]US2002030675 (KAWAI TOMOAKI [JP]) [X] 1-7 * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2002095014 (CANON KK) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [X] - JON SIRAGUSA, DAVID C SWIFT, "General Purpose Stereoscopic Data Descriptor", (20000605), URL: http://www.vrex.com/developer/sterdesc.pdf, (20080418), XP002477340 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH11127369 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2002095014 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2002095018 (CANON KK) |