EP1625843 - NIPPLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Combi Corporation 6-7, Moto-Asakusa 2-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 111-0041 / JP | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, M., Minami-urawa techno-center Combi Corp 36-18, Minami-urawa 3-chome, Minami-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 336-0017 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMIZU, N, Minami-urawa techno-center Combi Corp 36-18, Minami-urawa 3-chome, Minami-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 336-001 / JP | 03 /
KAN, T., Minami Corporation 2-39, Nishibori 5-chome, Sakura-ka Saitama-shi, Saitama 338-0832 / JP | 04 /
BUKAWA, W., Combi Corporation 2-39, Nishibori 5-chome, Sakura-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 338-0832 / JP | 05 /
WATANABE, T., Combi Corporation 2-39, Nishibori 5-chome, Sakura-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 338-0832 / JP | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Liesegang, Roland FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04728413.8 | 20.04.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004JP05628 | Priority number, date | WO2003JP06286 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: PCT/JP0306/286 | [2006/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103258 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625843 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61J11/00, A61J17/00, A61J19/00 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
A61J17/001 (EP,US);
A61J11/00 (KR);
A61J7/0053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIPPEL-VORRICHTUNG | [2006/07] | English: | NIPPLE DEVICE | [2006/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAMELON | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2005 | Translation filed | 28.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 25.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2246555 (GEORGE CHRISTOPHER) [A] 1-10,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5123915 (MILLER LAWRENCE E [US], et al) [A] 1-10,15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9825572 (CROWE D E [US], et al) [A] 1-10,15-17* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH09226848 (NISSHO KK); | [Y]JPH06508Y ; | [Y]JPH065637U |