EP1626880 - PLASTIC SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2006/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLISCH, Thomas Herzogstr. 10 80803 München / DE | 02 /
HAWLITZKI, Georg Albert-Schweitzer-Str. 17 85375 Neufahrn / DE | [2006/08] | Application number, filing date | 04728526.7 | 21.04.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004EP04195 | Priority number, date | DE2003124248 | 28.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10324248 | [2006/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004106121 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626880 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
B60R21/2165 (EP,US);
B29C45/0053 (EP,US);
B29C45/14778 (EP,US);
B23K2103/42 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14901 (EP,US);
B29C45/1418 (EP,US);
B29K2713/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/36] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFTRÄGER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/08] | English: | PLASTIC SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2006/08] | French: | SUPPORT EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/25] | 16.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002000711 (SCHMIDT WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0024] - [0033]; claim 2 * [Y] 7,9-11; | [XY]US6524505 (BISOGNIN JULIEN [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * column 4, line 16 - column 7, line 13 * [Y] 10; | [Y]US6294124 (BAUER DAVID J [US]) [Y] 10 * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 17; figures 8-12 *; | [Y]US5902428 (GALLAGHER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 3, lines 45-67; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2003020202 (UENO SHIGEHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 9,11 * paragraphs [0049] - [0054] - [0075] - [0078]; figures 1-4B * |