EP1621392 - HEIGHT-ADJUSTING DEVICE FOR AUTOMOBILE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Masami, Technical Center, TS Tech Co. Ltd 118-1, Oaza Ota, Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun, Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | [2011/40] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Masami, Technical Center, TS Tech Co. Ltd 118-1, Oaza Ota, Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun, Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Piazzale Arnaldo, 2 25121 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 04728662.0 | 21.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004JP05722 | Priority number, date | JP20030115957 | 21.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003115957 | [2006/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004094181 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621392 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621392 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/16, A47C7/02 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B60N2/1615 (EP,US);
B60N2/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/30] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HÖHENEINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGSITZ | [2006/05] | English: | HEIGHT-ADJUSTING DEVICE FOR AUTOMOBILE SEAT | [2006/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE HAUTEUR POUR SIEGE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2005 | Translation filed | 21.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 29.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9736766 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]); | [A]US6217115 (DOWNEY HUGH D [CA], et al); | [A]JP2001138780 (FUJI KIKO KK) | by applicant | JP2001138780 |