EP1625067 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING AIR RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖGDBERG, Ola Kungstensgatan 53 A S-113 59 Stockholm / SE | [2006/07] | Application number, filing date | 04728993.9 | 22.04.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004SE00609 | Priority number, date | SE20030001352 | 09.05.2003 Original published format: SE 0301352 | [2006/07] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004098982 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625067 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625067 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D35/00 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
B62D35/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/82 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES LUFTWIDERSTANDS | [2006/07] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING AIR RESISTANCE | [2006/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE LA RESISTANCE A L'AIR | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2004 | Translation filed | 09.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | PL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | IE | 22.04.2008 | LU | 22.04.2008 | CH | 30.04.2008 | LI | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 22.04.2008 | ||
LU | 22.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 22.04.2008 | ||
LU | 22.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 22.04.2008 | ||
LU | 22.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 22.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 22.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.04.2008 | ||
LI | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2068851 (BLETSOE D); | [A]US4601508 (KERIAN PAUL D [US]); | [A]DE3619959 (IVECO MAGIRUS [DE]); | [A]DE3620843 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US5407245 (GEROPP DIETER [DE]) |