EP1623709 - REMEDY FOR RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8510 / JP | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKADA, Yoshihiro Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 33-94 Enoki-cho, Suita-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
KANEKO, Munekiyo Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd., 12-2 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
TAGASHIRA, Rie Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 33-94 Enoki-cho, Suita-shi, Osaka / JP | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/06] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04729765.0 | 27.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004JP06105 | Priority number, date | JP20030125523 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003125523 | [2006/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004096230 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1623709 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5377, A61P19/02, A61P29/00, C07D261/14 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D261/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RHEUMATOIDER ARTHRITIS | [2006/06] | English: | REMEDY FOR RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS | [2006/06] | French: | REMEDE CONTRE LA POLYARTHRITE RHUMATOIDE | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2005 | Translation filed | 24.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0176557 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al) [X] 17-20* example 5 *; | [X]WO02092094 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP3237608B ; | [X]JP3244672B ; | [X] - TAGASHIRA SHUZO ET AL., "Shinki ko-rheumatism-zai SMP-114 no adjuvant kansetsuen ni taisuru sayo", ENSHO.SAISEI, (2001), vol. 21, no. 4, page 472, XP002984753 | [X] - NISHIKAKU F. ET AL., "Antiinflammatory and joint protective effect of SMP-114 in murine collagen-induced arthritis", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, (2002), vol. 61, no. SUPPLEMENT 1, page 194, XP002984754 | [X] - NISHIKAKU F. ET AL., "Suppression of experimental arthritis by treatment with a novel DMARD, SMP-114", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES, (2001), vol. 60, no. SUPPLEMENT 1, page 159, XP002984755 |