EP1604527 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EMBEDDING A BINARY PIECE OF USER DATA IN A CARRIER SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULLER, Gerald Leopoldstr. 13 99089 Erfurt / DE | 02 /
GEIGER, Ralf Täublingerstr. 35 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
KOLLER, Jürgen Flössergasse 11e 81369 Muenchen / DE | [2006/19] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
SCHULLER, Gerald Leopoldstr. 13 99089 Erfurt / DE | ||
02 /
GEIGER, Ralf Muenzstrasse 8c 98693 Ilmenau / DE | |||
03 /
KOLLER, Jürgen Flössergasse 11e 81369 Muenchen / DE | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04729869.0 | 28.04.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004EP04481 | Priority number, date | DE20031021983 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10321983 | [2005/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102969 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604527 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604527 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N1/32, G10L19/00 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
H04N1/32192 (EP,US);
H04N21/236 (KR);
G06T1/0028 (EP,US);
G10L19/018 (EP,US);
H04N1/32187 (EP,US);
H04N21/23892 (EP,US);
H04N21/8358 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
G06T2201/0051 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2006/24] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBETTEN EINER BINÄREN NUTZINFORMATION IN EIN TRÄGERSIGNAL | [2005/50] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR EMBEDDING A BINARY PIECE OF USER DATA IN A CARRIER SIGNAL | [2005/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR INCORPORER UNE INFORMATION UTILE DANS UN SIGNAL PORTEUR | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9733391 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-29 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, line 1 *; | [A]US2002164048 (BRUCKSTEIN ALFRED M [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract ** page 1, column L, paragraph 4 - page 1, column R, paragraph 8 *; | [X] - JUN TIAN ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "High capacity reversible data embedding and content authentication", 2003 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). HONG KONG, APRIL 6 - 10, 2003, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030406), VOL. 1 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7663-3, pages III517 - III520, XP010639123 [X] 1-29 * the whole document * | [A] - JONG RYUL KIM ET AL, "A robust wavelet-based digital watermarking using level-adaptive thresholding", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1999. ICIP 99. PROCEEDINGS. 1999 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KOBE, JAPAN 24-28 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), ISBN 0-7803-5467-2, pages 226 - 230, XP010369108 [A] 1-29 * page 227, column L, paragraph 2.2 - page 227, column R, paragraph 2.3 * | [A] - GEIGER R ET AL, "Fine grain scalable perceptual and lossless audio coding based on INTMDCT", 2003 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). HONG KONG, APRIL 6 - 10, 2003, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030406), VOL. 1 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7663-3, pages V445 - V448, XP010639304 [A] 1-29 * page 446, column L, paragraph 4. - page 446, column R, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2003.1200002 | [A] - GEIGER R ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Integer low delay and MDCT filter banks", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 36TH. ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, & COMPUTERS. PACIFIC GROOVE, CA, NOV. 3 - 6, 2002, ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021103), VOL. 1 OF 2. CONF. 36, ISBN 0-7803-7576-9, pages 811 - 815, XP010638316 [A] 1-29 * page 227, column L, paragraph 2.2 - page 227, column R, paragraph 2.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2002.1197291 |