EP1618746 - PICTURE CODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNUKSELA, Miska Linnunlaulunkuja 9 B5 FI-36110 Ruutana / FI | [2007/03] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
HANNUKSELA, Miska Kukkaniitynkatu 4 B FI-33710 Tampere / FI | Representative(s) | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2006/04] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 04730281.5 | 29.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004FI50052 | Priority number, date | US20030427714 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: US 427714 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004098195 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618746 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/42 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/177 (EP,US);
H04N19/196 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/04] | English: | PICTURE CODING METHOD | [2006/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE CODAGE D'IMAGE | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5510840 (YONEMITSU JUN [JP], et al); | [X]US5784494 (STRONGIN GEOFFREY [US], et al); | [A]US6310915 (WELLS AARON [US], et al); | [AP]US2003128766 (TAHARA KATSUMI [JP], et al); | [A]US2002067768 (HURST ROBERT N [US]) | by applicant | US2003035484 | US2003035587 |