EP1625128 - THERMAL ENERGY STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seidel, Pessach Ma'ale HaOren Street 25 90820 Motzan Ilit / IL | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/07] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04730360.7 | 29.04.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004IL00360 | Priority number, date | IL20030155665 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: IL 15566503 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004097320 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1625128 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01K13/02, C07D519/00, A61K31/4747, A61P25/00, A61P7/10, F28D20/02 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
F28D20/023 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
F28D20/0039 (EP,US);
F28D20/021 (EP,US);
F28D20/025 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | F01K13/02, C07D519/00, A61K31/4747, A61P25/00, A61P7/10 | ||
Former IPC [2006/07] | C07D471/10, C07D519/00, A61K31/4747, A61P25/00, A61P7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERUNG THERMALER ENERGIE | [2006/07] | English: | THERMAL ENERGY STORAGE | [2006/07] | French: | STOCKAGE D' NERGIE THERMIQUE | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 30.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 31.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 14.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2007 | 30.04.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2008 | 30.04.2017 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2017 | 30.04.2018 | 15   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0546204 (SHINKO IND COMPANY LIMITED [JP]) [A] 10* the whole document *; | [X]EP0683362 (KRUCK ALFONS [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,12,19,21 * abstract * * column 8 *; | [X]DE19648652 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,19,21 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19856938 (LEIDIG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20013247U (SAILER ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10126916 (GEERKENS NORBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,12,19,21 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4129177 (ADCOCK THOMAS P); | [X]US4357932 (STACY W DODD); | [A]US4373573 (MADWED ALBERT [US]) | Examination | DE2839258 | by applicant | DE10126916 |