EP1740743 - A BOTTOM-UP ELECTROSPINNING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/02] | A BOTTOM-UP ELECTROSPINNING DEVICES, AND NANOFIBERS PREPARED BY USING THE SAME | ||
[2008/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Hak-Yong 410-6, Pyunghwa-dong 2ga, Wansan-gu Jeonju-si Chonrabuk-do 560-865 / KR | For all designated states Park, Jong-Cheol 109-1202 LG XI Apt, 430 Ichon-dong, Yongsan-gu Seoul, 140-030 / KR | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04730364.9 | 29.04.2004 | [2007/02] | WO2004KR00985 | Priority number, date | KR20040019543 | 23.03.2004 Original published format: KR 2004019543 | [2007/02] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090653 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740743 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1740743 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/00, D01D5/24 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
D01D5/0084 (EP,US);
E05B15/00 (KR);
D01D5/0061 (EP,US);
D01D5/0069 (EP,US);
E05B9/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | D01D4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VON UNTEN NACH OBEN ARBEITENDE ELEKTROSPINNVORRICHTUNGEN | [2008/34] | English: | A BOTTOM-UP ELECTROSPINNING DEVICES | [2008/34] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ELECTROFILAGE ASCENDANT | [2008/34] |
Former [2007/02] | VON UNTEN NACH OBEN ARBEITENDE ELEKTROSPINNVORRICHTUNGEN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE NANOFASERN | ||
Former [2007/02] | A BOTTOM-UP ELECTROSPINNING DEVICES, AND NANOFIBERS PREPARED BY USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2007/02] | DISPOSITIFS D'ELECTROFILAGE ASCENDANT ET NANOFIBRES AINSI OBTENUES | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2004 | Translation filed | 19.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | EE | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | NL | 10.06.2009 | PL | 10.06.2009 | RO | 10.06.2009 | SI | 10.06.2009 | SK | 10.06.2009 | TR | 10.06.2009 | BG | 10.09.2009 | SE | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | ES | 21.09.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | HU | 11.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
HU | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]WO02092888 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-10,12-16 * the whole document *[X] 11; | [E]WO2005073441 (KIM HAK-YONG [KR], et al) [E] 11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH03161502 (ICI JAPAN); | [A]WO03004735 (KIM HAG-YONG [KR]); | [A]KR20030065799 (KIM HAK YONG [KR], et al); | [A]WO03080905 (NANO TECHNICS CO LTD [KR], et al) | by applicant | WO02092888 | KR20030065799 | WO03080905 | WO2005073441 |