EP1622482 - SUSPENDED SLEEPING BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brenner, Rainer Karl-Danner-Strasse 30 97340 Segnitz / DE | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRENNER, Rainer Karl-Danner-Strasse 30 97340 Segnitz / DE | 02 /
SINGLER, Ralph Altenbergstr. 25 97340 Marktbreit / DE | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Küchler, Stefan Stefan T. Küchler Patentanwalt Färberstraße 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Küchler, Stefan Patentanwalt Färberstrasse 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04730495.1 | 30.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004EP04596 | Priority number, date | EP20030009983 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03009983 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004095978 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622482 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622482 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/22, A47G9/08 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
A45F3/22 (EP,US);
A47G9/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄNGE-SCHLAFSACK | [2006/06] | English: | SUSPENDED SLEEPING BAG | [2006/06] | French: | SAC DE COUCHAGE A SUSPENDRE | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 11.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.04.2010 | DK | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | IE | 07.04.2010 | IT | 07.04.2010 | NL | 07.04.2010 | PL | 07.04.2010 | RO | 07.04.2010 | SE | 07.04.2010 | SI | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | TR | 07.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | AT | 30.04.2010 | BE | 30.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | LU | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | FR | 07.06.2010 | BG | 07.07.2010 | GB | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | ES | 18.07.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | HU | 08.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
TR | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
AT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
LU | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 07.06.2010 | ||
GB | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | BG | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
AT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
LU | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 07.06.2010 | ||
GB | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
AT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 07.06.2010 | ||
GB | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
HU | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 07.04.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
AT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 07.06.2010 | ||
GB | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
AT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 07.06.2010 | ||
GB | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
AT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CZ | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | DK | 07.04.2010 | |
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 07.04.2010 | |
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 07.04.2010 | |
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 07.04.2010 | |
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 07.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR374442 (WILHELM REINHARD EDOUARD KEIL [FR]) [A] 1* sentence 12 - sentence 18; figure 3 *; | [A]FR974722 (NATHAN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2694208 (CHRISTENSEN HAROLD A) [A] 1-3,7 * figure 1 *; | [DA]US3675256 (TALLARICO ROBERT A, et al) [DA] 1,14,18 * column 3, line 5 - line 10; figures 8-12 *; | [DX]US4001902 (HALL JOHN O, et al) [DX] 1,3,14,17-19 * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | FR374442 | FR974722 | US2694208 | US3675256 | US4001902 |