EP1625341 - COMBINED ELECTRICAL MECHANICAL FIRING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metal Storm Limited Level 34, 345 Queen Street Brisbane, QLD 4000 / AU | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'DWYER, James, Michael Unit 162, Level 27, 32 Macrossan Street Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | 02 /
O'DWYER, Sean, Patrick 104 Brentnall Street Norman Park, Queensland 4170 / AU | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2006/07] | Kemp, Paul Geoffrey, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04730802.8 | 03.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004AU00579 | Priority number, date | AU20030902103 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: AU 2003902103 | AU20030902223 | 09.05.2003 Original published format: AU 2003902223 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004097326 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625341 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F41A19/62, F41A19/61, F41A19/13, F42C19/08 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
F42B5/08 (EP,US);
F41A19/61 (EP,US);
F41A19/62 (EP,US);
F41A19/65 (EP,US);
F42B5/035 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/07] | F41A19/62, F41A19/61, F41A19/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE ELEKTROMECHANISCHE ZÜNDSYSTEME | [2006/07] | English: | COMBINED ELECTRICAL MECHANICAL FIRING SYSTEMS | [2006/07] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE MISE A FEU ELECTROMECANIQUES COMBINES | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 30.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 18.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB965413 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [A] 1,5,10 * page 1, line 9 - line 69 ** page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 14 *; | [A]WO0190680 (METAL STORM LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 10, lines 1-13; figures 1,2; claims 1,6,17 *; | [A]DE10049520 (LELL PETER [DE]) [A] 2,6 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] - [0028]; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US3505927 (DRISCOLL JOHN J); | [X]US5901488 (OBERLIN RICHARD P [US]); | [X]US3650174 (NELSEN THOMAS SLOAN); | [Y]WO9855819 (DWYER JAMES MICHAEL O [AU]); | [Y]US4285153 (CROUCH ALFERD H); | [Y]US3854231 (BROYLES H); | [A]US3421244 (REED FREDERICK P) | by applicant | WO9420809 | WO9704281 | US3421244 |