EP1625390 - ADAPTER FOR CONNECTING A SENSOR MODULE TO A TRANSDUCER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Conducta Gesellschaft für Mess- und Regeltechnik mbH + Co.KG. Dieselstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2010/43] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Conducta Gesellschaft für Mess- und Regeltechnik mbH + Co.KG. Dieselstrasse 24 D-70839 Gerlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTMER, Detlev Distelweg 34 75433 Maulbronn / DE | 02 /
PECHSTEIN, Torsten Reichsstrasse 11 01445 Radebeul / DE | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2006/07] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 04730968.7 | 04.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004EP04697 | Priority number, date | DE20031022276 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322276 | [2006/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102177 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625390 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625390 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416, G01N27/28 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
G01N27/286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER ZUM ANSCHLUSS EINES SENSORMODULS AN EIN UMFORMERMODUL | [2006/07] | English: | ADAPTER FOR CONNECTING A SENSOR MODULE TO A TRANSDUCER MODULE | [2006/07] | French: | ADAPTATEUR SERVANT A RACCORDER UN MODULE DETECTEUR A UN MODULE TRANSDUCTEUR | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | IE | 27.10.2010 | IT | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | ES | 07.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | AT | 04.05.2011 | LU | 04.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
AT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LU | 04.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
AT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LU | 04.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
AT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LU | 04.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
AT | 04.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003210438 ; | [X]JPS61210958 ; | [A]US4926380 (HARADA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * columns 3-4; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US5804971 (CUMMING COLIN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]GB2323172 (KUHN ANSELM THOMAS [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * abstract * * page 1; claims 1-14 * [Y] 3-9; | [A]US5821405 (DICKEY TERRY LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 65 *; | [XY]US2001023386 (AMTMANN MARKUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0048] - [0053]; figure 3 * [Y] 5; | [Y]DE10055090 (CONDUCTA ENDRESS & HAUSER [DE]) [Y] 3-9 * abstract * * columns 1-7 *; | [PDA]DE10218606 (CONDUCTA ENDRESS & HAUSER [DE]) [PDA] 1-10* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003210438 A 20030729 (TYCO HEALTHCARE JAPAN INC;TSE:KK) [X] 1,3,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870206), vol. 011, no. 042, Database accession no. (P - 545), & JP61210958 A 19860919 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,10 * abstract * * columns 1-7 * |