EP1625503 - METHOD FOR DATA SIGNAL TRANSFER ACROSS DIFFERENT CLOCK-DOMAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIELAGE, Paul c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/07] | de Jong, Durk Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04731079.2 | 04.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004IB50581 | Priority number, date | EP20030101284 | 09.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03101284 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004100000 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625503 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
H04L7/02 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENSIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG ZWISCHEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN TAKTBEREICHEN | [2006/07] | English: | METHOD FOR DATA SIGNAL TRANSFER ACROSS DIFFERENT CLOCK-DOMAINS | [2006/07] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE TRANSFERT DE SIGNAUX DE DONNEES SUR DIFFERENTS DOMAINES D'HORLOGE | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5884100 (NORMOYLE KEVIN B [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 18 * * column 3, line 43 - line 48 * * column 3, line 56 - line 59 * * column 8, line 18 - line 36 * * claim 1 * * claim 5 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0590212 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 2, line 11 - line 16 * * column 5, line 6 - line 26 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 12 * * column 7, line 41 - line 49 * * column 8, line 50 - line 53 * * claim 1 * * figure 3 *; | [X]US5615327 (MAGEE STEPHEN C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 23 - line 27 * * column 18, line 61 - line 65 * * column 20, line 54 - line 59 * * figure 12 *; | [A]EP1124179 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 45 - line 48 * * column 2, line 2 - line 3 * * column 4, line 37 - line 39 * * column 9, line 14 - line 18 * * figure 6 *; | [A] - CREWS M ET AL, "PRACTICAL DESIGN FOR TRANSFERRING SIGNALS BETWEEN CLOCK DOMAINS", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO. NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, US, (20030220), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0012-7515, pages 65 - 66,68,71, XP001159987 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |