EP1622583 - HAIR CARE PRODUCTS WITH STYLING PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states Hans Schwarzkopf GmbH & Co. KG Hohenzollernring 127 22763 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZÜDEL FERNANDES, Nicole Anberg 6 20459 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
RICHTERS, Bernd Focksweg 5 21129 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
SCHULZE ZUR WIESCHE, Erik Kremper Str. 7 20251 Hamburg / DE | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/51] |
Former [2006/06] | Semrau, Markus Henkel KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04731350.7 | 06.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004EP04825 | Priority number, date | DE20031022059 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322059 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004100908 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622583 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622583 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/12, A61K8/81, A61Q5/06 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
A61Q5/12 (EP);
A61K8/8152 (EP);
A61K8/8182 (EP);
A61Q5/06 (EP);
A61K2800/594 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | A61K8/81, A61Q5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HAARBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL MIT STYLING-EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2006/06] | English: | HAIR CARE PRODUCTS WITH STYLING PROPERTIES | [2006/06] | French: | PRODUITS DE TRAITEMENT CAPILLAIRE A PROPRIETES COIFFANTES | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2004 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | IT | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | AT | 06.05.2017 | IE | 06.05.2017 | LU | 06.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.05.2004 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.05.2004 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.05.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 06.05.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 06.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02096381 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-19 * Conditioner 5 und Seite 71, Zeilen 5 - 9;; page 28, line 18 - page 34, line 19; example 5 *; | [X]WO0191705 (PROCTER & GAMBLE ET AL.) [X] 1-19 * page 8, line 4 - page 13, line 31; examples 13-15,17; claim - * * page 63, line 33 - page 64, line 5 *; | [X]WO0176543 (PROCTER & GAMBLE ET AL.) [X] 1-19 * page 6, line 24 - page 12, line 22; examples 1-6,9,12; claim - * * page 52, lines 28-33 *; | [X]WO0174310 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-19 * page 15, line 23 - page 20, line 20; example 8 * |