EP1625304 - MULTISTAGE CENTRIFUGAL PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URBAN, Jörg Otto-Dill-Strasse 2 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
KOCHANOWSKI, Wolfgang Im Elzerich 2 55452 Windesheim / DE | 03 /
BRECHT, Bernhard Rotkreuzstrasse 21 67433 Neustadt/Weinstrasse / DE | 04 /
SCHARPF, Stephan Semmelweissstrasse 4 67547 Worms / DE | [2006/07] | Application number, filing date | 04731592.4 | 07.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004EP04873 | Priority number, date | DE20031022382 | 17.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322382 | [2006/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109117 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625304 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625304 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/24, F04D1/06 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
F04D29/043 (EP,US);
F04D1/063 (EP,US);
F04D29/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGE KREISELPUMPE | [2006/07] | English: | MULTISTAGE CENTRIFUGAL PUMP | [2006/07] | French: | POMPE CENTRIFUGE MULTI-ETAGEE | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2006 | CZ | 13.09.2006 | EE | 13.09.2006 | IE | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | PL | 13.09.2006 | RO | 13.09.2006 | SI | 13.09.2006 | SK | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | BG | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | HU | 14.03.2007 | LU | 07.05.2007 | BE | 31.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2024/23] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
TR | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
HU | 14.03.2007 | ||
LU | 07.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
HU | 14.03.2007 | ||
LU | 07.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/41] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 13.09.2006 | |
PL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | PL | 13.09.2006 | |
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4669956 (BRUNEL ROLAND [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * column 1, line 43 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0318638 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [X] 1* figure 1 * |