EP1620718 - METHOD OF QUANTIFYING THE SURFACTANT OF A PROTEIN PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes Biopharma DK A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2009/11] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Novozymes Biopharma UK Limited Castle Court 59, Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Novozymes Delta Limited Castle Court 59, Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Delta Biotechnology Limited Castle Court, 59 Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTON, Philip Harvey, Novozymes Biopharma UK Limited Castle Court, 59 Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | 02 /
CAMERON, Jason, Novozymes Biopharma UK Limited Castle Court, 59 Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | [2008/43] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
MORTON, Philip Harvey, Delta Biotechnology Limited Castle Court, 59 Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | ||
02 /
CAMERON, Jason, Delta Biotechnology Limited Castle Court, 59 Castle Boulevard Nottingham NG7 1FD / GB | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/29] |
Former [2006/05] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04731652.6 | 07.05.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004GB01992 | Priority number, date | GB20030010347 | 07.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0310347 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004099234 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1620718 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620718 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/22, G01N21/78, C11D1/00, C07K1/30 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
C07K1/30 (EP,GB,KR,US);
G01N31/22 (GB,KR);
C11D1/00 (GB,KR);
G01N21/78 (GB);
G01N33/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TENSID-QUANTIFIZIERUNG EINES PROTEINPRÄPARATES | [2006/05] | English: | METHOD OF QUANTIFYING THE SURFACTANT OF A PROTEIN PREPARATION | [2006/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE QUANTIFICATION DE TENSOACTIF D'UNE PREPARATION PROTEINIQUE | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 02.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | PL | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | LU | 07.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
LU | 07.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
LU | 07.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BG | 29.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2435759 (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | [X]WO02086492 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); |