EP1625438 - ELECTROWETTING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2012/41] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN AS, Marco, A., J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HENDRIKS, Bernardus, H., W. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KUIPER, Stein c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
WEEKAMP, Johannus, W. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/07] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04731700.3 | 07.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004IB50614 | Priority number, date | EP20030076428 | 09.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03076428 | EP20030103759 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: EP 03103759 | EP20040100868 | 04.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04100868 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004099847 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625438 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625438 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02, G02B3/14 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
G02B26/005 (EP,US);
G02B26/02 (KR);
G02B3/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Title | German: | ZELLEN FÜR ELEKTROWETTING | [2006/07] | English: | ELECTROWETTING CELLS | [2006/07] | French: | CELLULES D'ELECTROMOUILLAGE | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2004 | AT | 10.10.2012 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | MC | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | PL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | IE | 07.05.2013 | LU | 07.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DX]JP2002162506 ; | [X]US5541776 (KOBAYASHI NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-14 * column 4, line 50 - column 8, line 32; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1069450 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6369954 (BERGE BRUNO [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 3 - line 52 * * column 5, line 28 - line 64 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]US5864128 (PLESKO GEORGE A [US]) [A] 18 * column 11, line 46 - column 12, line 51; figure 19 * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002162506 A 20020607 (CANON INC) [DX] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US5541776 |