EP1627384 - METHOD FOR SETTING DATA CARRIER SPEED IN A DATA CARRIER DRIVE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENAERTS, Ludo, A., L. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04732392.8 | 12.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004IB50663 | Priority number, date | EP20030101414 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03101414 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102555 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627384 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627384 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/28, G06F3/06, G06F5/06 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
G11B19/26 (EP,US);
G11B19/28 (KR);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F5/06 (KR);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G06F2205/061 (EP,US);
G06F5/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN DER DATENTRÄGER-GESCHWINDIGKEIT IN EINEM DATENTRÄGER-LAUFWERK | [2006/08] | English: | METHOD FOR SETTING DATA CARRIER SPEED IN A DATA CARRIER DRIVE APPARATUS | [2006/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE LA VITESSE D'UN SUPPORT DE DONNEES DANS UN APPAREIL DU TYPE UNITE DE SUPPORT DE DONNEES | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.09.2007 | BE | 19.09.2007 | CH | 19.09.2007 | CY | 19.09.2007 | CZ | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | EE | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | LI | 19.09.2007 | NL | 19.09.2007 | PL | 19.09.2007 | RO | 19.09.2007 | SI | 19.09.2007 | SK | 19.09.2007 | TR | 19.09.2007 | BG | 19.12.2007 | SE | 19.12.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | ES | 30.12.2007 | PT | 19.02.2008 | HU | 20.03.2008 | GB | 12.05.2008 | IE | 12.05.2008 | LU | 12.05.2008 | IT | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | FR | 02.06.2008 | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
TR | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
HU | 20.03.2008 | ||
GB | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
LU | 12.05.2008 | ||
IT | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
TR | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
HU | 20.03.2008 | ||
GB | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
LU | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
HU | 20.03.2008 | ||
GB | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
LU | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
GB | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
LU | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
GB | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
GB | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
GB | 12.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
IE | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 19.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5513326 (NUTE ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1,20-23 * column 3 - column 4 *; | [DA]US5659799 (WU CHENG [SG], et al) [DA] 1-23 * column 3 - column 6 *; | [A]US5982726 (RO JIN TAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 5 - column 12 *; | [A]CN1393865 (JIANXING ELECT SCIENCE & TECH [CN]) [A] 1-23* abstract *; | [PX]EP1363276 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,20-23 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0075] *; | [A] - "SPINDLE ROTATION OPTIMIZATION FOR DISK WRITE/READ OPERATION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19960601), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 147 - 149, XP000678553 [A] 1-23 * abstract * |