EP1623988 - PROTEIN REFOLDING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Bio Research Co., Ltd. 88 Kamihongou Matsudo-shi Chiba 271-0064 / JP | For all designated states Proteomtech, Inc. 5980, Horton Street, Suite 405 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAJIMA, Hideji c/o Universal Bio Research Co., Ltd 88, Kamihongou Matsudo-shi, Chiba 271-0064 / JP | 02 /
LIN, Xinli c/o ProteomTech, Inc. 5980,Horton Street Suite 405, Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 03 /
BURROWES, Peter c/o PSS Bio Instruments, Inc. 6052 Industrial Way, Suite H Livermore, CA 94551 / US | 04 /
KUSUMOTO, Chris c/o PSS Bio Instruments, Inc. 6052 Industrial Way, Suite H Livermore, CA 94551 / US | [2007/26] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
TAJIMA, Hideji c/o Universal Bio Research Co., Ltd 88, Kamihongou Matsudo-shi, Chiba 271-0064 / JP | ||
02 /
LIN, Xinli c/o ProteomTech, Inc. 5980,Horton Street Suite 405, Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | |||
03 /
BURROWES, Peter c/o Bio-Strand, Inc. 1258 Quarry Lane Suite H, Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | |||
04 /
KUSUMOTO, Chris c/o PSS Bio Instruments, Inc. 1258 Quarry Lane Suite H, Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04732485.0 | 12.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004JP06681 | Priority number, date | JP20030135108 | 13.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003135108 | US20030471549P | 19.05.2003 Original published format: US 471549 P | [2006/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101601 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1623988 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/13, G01N27/416, G01N21/17 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
C07K1/1136 (EP,US);
G01N21/5907 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | C07K1/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPARAT ZUR PROTEINRÜCKFALTUNG UND DESSEN ANWENDUNG | [2007/20] | English: | PROTEIN REFOLDING APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2006/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE REPLIAGE DE PROTEINES ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2006/06] |
Former [2006/06] | PROTEINRÜCKFALTUNGSAPPARAT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN ANWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2005 | Translation filed | 08.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO0155174 (OKLAHOMA MED RES FOUND [US]); | [A]JPH0843400 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) |