EP1624941 - GYM BIKE THAT USES THE EFFECT OF STROBOSCOPIC LIGHTS FOR THE IMMEDIATE VISUAL CONTROL OF THE USER'S FLYWHEEL REVOLUTION SPEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panatta, Rodolfo 2, Via Madonna della Fonte 62021 Apiro (MC) / IT | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | [2006/07] | Application number, filing date | 04732721.8 | 13.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004IT00268 | Priority number, date | IT2003AN00028 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: IT AN20030028 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101077 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624941 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624941 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/06, A63B24/00, G01P3/40 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
A63B22/0605 (EP,US);
A63B22/06 (KR);
A63B24/00 (KR);
G01P3/40 (EP,KR,US);
A63B2071/0638 (EP,US);
A63B21/225 (EP,US);
A63B2220/34 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FITNESS-FAHRRAD, DAS DIE WIRKUNG VON STROBOSCOPISCHER-LICHTERN FÜR DIE UNMITTELBARE SEHKONTROLLE DER SCHWUNGRAD-UMDREHUNGSGESCHWINDIGKEIT DES BENUTZERS GEBRAUCHT | [2006/07] | English: | GYM BIKE THAT USES THE EFFECT OF STROBOSCOPIC LIGHTS FOR THE IMMEDIATE VISUAL CONTROL OF THE USER'S FLYWHEEL REVOLUTION SPEED | [2006/07] | French: | BICYCLETTE D'ENTRAINEMENT UTILISANT L'EFFET DE LUMIERES STROBOSCOPIQUES POUR LA REGULATION VISUELLE IMMEDIATE DE LA VITESSE DE ROTATION DU VOLANT D'INERTIE DE L'UTILISATEUR | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2007 | BE | 11.07.2007 | CH | 11.07.2007 | CY | 11.07.2007 | CZ | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | EE | 11.07.2007 | FI | 11.07.2007 | LI | 11.07.2007 | PL | 11.07.2007 | RO | 11.07.2007 | SI | 11.07.2007 | SK | 11.07.2007 | TR | 11.07.2007 | BG | 11.10.2007 | SE | 11.10.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | PT | 11.12.2007 | HU | 12.01.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
HU | 12.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3031313 (CHRISTOPEIT HORST) [A] 1-5* page 8, line 32 - page 12, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6482130 (PASERO PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 8, line 18 - line 24; figures 12,14 * |