EP1646349 - INCONTINENCE PADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D'Alcini, Franco 14, Via Val di Foro I-65124 Pescara (PE) / IT | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | [2006/16] | Application number, filing date | 04732723.4 | 13.05.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004IT00269 | Priority number, date | IT2003CH00012 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: IT CH20030012 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007052 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1646349 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646349 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/64 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
A61F13/5622 (EP,US);
A61F13/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | 12.01.2006 | HR | 12.01.2006 | LT | 12.01.2006 | LV | 12.01.2006 | MK | 12.01.2006 | Title | German: | INKONTINENZPRODUKT | [2006/16] | English: | INCONTINENCE PADS | [2006/16] | French: | TAMPONS D'INCONTINENCE | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 02.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.08.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2009 | BE | 08.07.2009 | CY | 08.07.2009 | CZ | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | EE | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | NL | 08.07.2009 | PL | 08.07.2009 | RO | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | SI | 08.07.2009 | SK | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | BG | 08.10.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | ES | 19.10.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | HU | 09.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
HU | 09.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 08.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5445628 (GIPSON WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 59 - line 64 * * column 2, line 26 - line 35 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 3 *; | [X]US2001034511 (HERMANSSON KENT [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * figure 1 * * claim 1 * * page 1, paragraphs 6,9 * * page 2, paragraphs 21,22 * * page 3, paragraph 26 *; | [X]US2001034512 (KARLSSON KATHARINA [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * page 1, paragraphs 1,5-7 * * page 2, paragraphs 16,21,22 *; | [X]US2002045881 (KUSIBOJOSKA LILJANA [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * figures 1,2 * * claim 1 * * page 1, paragraphs 1,3,6,7 * * page 2, paragraphs 17,18,20,22-25 *; | [X]US2002193776 (FERNFORS INGEMAR [SE]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraphs 2,8,10,11 * * page 2, paragraphs 27,28 * * page 3, paragraphs 29,32,34 *; | [X]WO03007863 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * page 1, line 5 - line 14 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 6 * * page 5, line 19 - line 23 *; | [X]US2003069558 (ALMBERG CHRISTIAN [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, paragraphs 9,10 * * page 2, paragraphs 27-30 * * page 3, paragraphs 33,35 *; | [A]US2003120253 (WENTZEL TOM K [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |