EP1625339 - HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMPEL, Peter Belvederegasse 10/2 1040 Wien / AT | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Grabherr, Claudia Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Grabherr, Claudia Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04732869.5 | 14.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004AT00172 | Priority number, date | AT20030000754 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: AT 7542003 | AT20030000755 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: AT 7552003 | [2006/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102099 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625339 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625339 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/053, F28F9/02, F28F9/22, F28F27/02 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
F28F9/0253 (EP,US);
F28D1/05375 (EP,US);
F28F13/06 (EP,US);
F28F9/0202 (EP,US);
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28F9/0265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2006/07] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER | [2006/07] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.08.2008 | CZ | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IE | 06.08.2008 | IT | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | PL | 06.08.2008 | RO | 06.08.2008 | SI | 06.08.2008 | SK | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | ES | 17.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | HU | 07.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 06.08.2008 | |
ES | 17.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5329990 (CHIGIRA HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10103584 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [DA] 1-20* abstract * |