EP1635857 - TREATMENT OF HAEMORRHAGIC SHOCK USING COMPLEMENT 5a RECEPTOR INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF QUEENSLAND St Lucia Brisbane, QLD 4072 / AU | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARKIN, Denis W. 23 Haberton Drive Balmoral Avenue Belfast BT9 6PF / GB | 02 /
LINDSAY, Thomas F. 200 Elizabeth Street, Eaton 5-306 Toronto, Ontario M5G 2C4 / CA | 03 /
TAYLOR, Stephen M. 17 Perdita Street Bellbird Park, Queensland 4300 / AU | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2006/12] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04732886.9 | 14.05.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004AU00642 | Priority number, date | AU20030902354 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: AU 2003902354 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004100975 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635857 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/12, A61P7/08 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
A61K38/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON HÄMORRHAGISCHEM SCHOCK UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KOMPLEMENT 5A REZEPTOR-HEMMERN | [2006/12] | English: | TREATMENT OF HAEMORRHAGIC SHOCK USING COMPLEMENT 5a RECEPTOR INHIBITORS | [2006/12] | French: | TRAITEMENT DU CHOC HEMORRAGIQUE AU MOYEN D'INHIBITEURS DU RECEPTEUR 5A COMPLEMENTAIRES | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 14.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 12.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9900406 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) | [Y] - HELLER T. ET AL., "Selection of a C5a receptor antagonist from phage libraries attenuating the inflammatory response in immune complex disease and ischemia/reperfusion injury", J. IMMUNOL., (19990615), vol. 163, no. 2, pages 985 - 994 | [Y] - YOUNGER J.G. ET AL., "Detrimental effects of complement activation in hemorrhagic shock", J. APPL. PHYSIOL., (200102), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 441 - 446 | [T] - SZEBENI J. ET AL., "Complement activation during hemorrhagic shock and resuscitation in swine", SHOCK, (200310), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 347 - 355 | [T] - HARKIN D.W. ET AL., "Complement C5a receptor antagonist attenuates multiple organ injury in a model of ruptured abdominal aortic aneurysm", J. VASC. SURG., (200401), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 196 - 206 | [A] - MORIKIS D., LAMBRIS J.D., "Structural aspects and design of low-molecular-mass complement inhibitors", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (200211), vol. 30, no. PT6, pages 1026 - 1036 | [A] - PACZKOWSKI N.J. ET AL., "Pharmacological characterization of antagonists of the C5a receptor", BR. J. PHARMACOL., (199912), vol. 128, no. 7, pages 1461 - 1466 | [A] - ZIMMERMANN T. ET AL., "The role of the complement system in the pathogenesis of multiple organ failure in shock", PROG. CLIN. BIOL. RES., (1989), vol. 308, pages 291 - 297 |