EP1633209 - WEIGHT MANAGEMENT BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2009/35] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states NESTEC S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERRUZZI, Mario Department of Food Science Purdue University, 745 Agriculture Mall Drive West Lafayette, IN 47907-2009 / US | 02 /
CILLIERS, Johann 1515 Cinnamon Drive Marysville, OH 43040 / US | 03 /
TUOT, James 8530 Stonechat Loop Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Schuller, Cornelis, et al Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Schüller, Cornelis, et al Nestec S.A. Intellectual Property Department Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2006/11] | Dale, Gavin Christopher Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 04733339.8 | 17.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004EP05272 | Priority number, date | US20030475973P | 04.06.2003 Original published format: US 475973 P | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110175 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633209 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633209 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/00, A23L1/09, A23L1/30, A23L1/308, A23L1/29, A23F3/16, A23C9/13 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
A23C9/152 (EP,US);
A23F3/14 (EP,US);
A23F3/16 (EP,US);
A23F3/163 (EP,US);
A23L2/38 (EP,US);
A23L2/39 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L27/34 (EP,US);
A23L29/244 (EP,US);
A23L29/35 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/2108, A23V2250/214, A23V2250/6422, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/264, A23V2250/242 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/2108, A23V2250/214, A23V2250/6422, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/1578 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/214, A23V2250/2116, A23V2250/2108, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/6422 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNK ZUR GEWICHTSKONTROLLE | [2006/11] | English: | WEIGHT MANAGEMENT BEVERAGE | [2006/11] | French: | BOISSON PERMETTANT DE GERER SON POIDS | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | IE | 17.05.2010 | LU | 17.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
IE | 17.05.2010 | ||
LU | 17.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
IE | 17.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002132780 (HEISEY MATTHEW THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-17,19-30 * page 1, paragraphs 5,8 * * page 5, paragraph 89 * * page 6, paragraphs 92,93 * * page 6, paragraphs 97,98 * * page 8, paragraphs 115,117,119,121,123,125,129 * * page 9, paragraphs 135-138,141,142 * * page 10, paragraphs 143,144,148 * * page 11, paragraph 158 * * page 12, paragraphs 170,171,180 * * page 14; examples 1,2 *; | [XD]WO02078469 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [XD] 1-6,8,10,12-17,19-21,28-30 * page 2, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 5, paragraph 1 - paragraph 6 * * page 7, paragraphs 2-5 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 7 * * page 13, paragraph 5 * * page 15, paragraph 7 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 22, paragraph 3 - page 23, paragraph 1 ** page 23, paragraph 6 * |