EP1629268 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING AT LEAST ONE OPTICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2013/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/09] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZINK, Peter, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
PANKERT, Joseph, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
DERRA, Günther, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 04 /
WEBER, Achim, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2013/20] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
ZINK, Peter, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
PANKERT, Joseph, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
DERRA, Günther, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
04 /
WEBER, Achim, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/20] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04733618.5 | 18.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004IB50734 | Priority number, date | EP20030101475 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03101475 | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004104707 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1629268 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1629268 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/22, G03F7/20 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
G21K1/06 (EP,US);
B08B7/00 (EP,US);
B08B7/0057 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/70166 (EP,US);
G03F7/70925 (EP,US);
G03F7/70941 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN MINDESTENS EINER OPTISCHEN KOMPONENTE | [2006/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING AT LEAST ONE OPTICAL COMPONENT | [2006/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR NETTOYER AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT OPTIQUE | [2012/45] |
Former [2006/09] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR NETTOYER AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 20.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2004 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | IT | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | AT | 18.05.2013 | IE | 18.05.2013 | LU | 18.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | FR | 15.07.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | GB | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
AT | 18.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 15.07.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GB | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
AT | 18.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 15.07.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GB | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
AT | 18.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 15.07.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GB | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 15.07.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GB | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 15.07.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 18.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 15.05.2013 | |
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | DK | 15.05.2013 | |
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | ES | 26.08.2013 | |
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 16.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DXAYI]US2002084425 (KLEBANOFF LEONARD E [US], et al) [DX] 1-9,14,19,44,46,47,56-64,69,74,81,95,96 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 * * column A * [A] 12-18,20-31,67-73,75,77-80,103-106 [Y] 45,51,95,102 [I] 10,11,43,65,66,76,79,94,97; | [YA]US6545272 (KONDO HIROYUKI [JP]) [Y] 45,51,95,102 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0122] * [A] 34-38,48-50,52-55,98-101; | [A]DE10138284 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [A] 32,33,39-42,82-93 * paragraph [0049]; figure 3a *; | [PX]US2004007246 (CHAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [PX] 1-7,9,19,20,22,25,56-62,64-67,74-76,81 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10061248 | WO02054115 |