EP1626350 - CONTENT DELIVERY DEVICE AND CONTENT RECEPTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Koji c/o Matshushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bld. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
TADA, Hiroyuki c/o Matshushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bld. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Junichi c/o Matshushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bld. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Takao c/o Matshushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bld. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2006/15] |
Former [2006/07] | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Koji 1-10-619, Ikuno, Katano-shi Osaka 576-0054 / JP | ||
02 /
TADA, Hiroyuki 2-12-3-302, Seki,Tama-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kangawa 214-0022 / JP | |||
03 /
SATO, Junichi 460-310, Nogaya-machi, Machida-shi Tokyo 195-0053 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Takao 6-23, Naritanishimachi, Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0005 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04733641.7 | 18.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004JP07040 | Priority number, date | JP20030140651 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003140651 | [2006/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102425 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626350 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, // G01C21/26, H04L29/08, H04W4/02 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
G01C21/26 (EP,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
H04L67/289 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/07] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSABLIEFERUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND INHALTSEMPFANGSEINRICHTUNG | [2006/07] | English: | CONTENT DELIVERY DEVICE AND CONTENT RECEPTION DEVICE | [2006/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIVRAISON DE CONTENU ET DISPOSITIF DE RECEPTION DE CONTENU | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2005 | Translation filed | 21.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5953722 (LAMPERT DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [I]US2002035432 (KUBICA BOGUSLAW [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002103781 (MORI SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [I]US2003033176 (HANCOCK S LEE [US]) [I] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A] - POTMESIL M, "Maps alive: viewing geospatial information on the WWW", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970901), vol. 29, no. 8-13, doi:10.1016/S0169-7552(97)00013-5, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1327 - 1342, XP004095328 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(97)00013-5 | International search | [A]WO0231441 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2003047034 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD); | [A] - TANIGUCHI K. ET AL., "Ido tanmatsu muke hoso tsushin renkei haishin system (sono 1) - ichi to tanmatsu ni tekio dekiru contents kijutsu hoshiki no teian -", JOHO KAGAKU GIJUTSU FORUM 2002 (FIT2002), (20020913), vol. 4, pages 187 - 188, XP002979697 | [A] - SATO J. ET AL., "Ido tanmatsu muke hoso tsushin renkei haishin system (sono 2) - ichi ni tekio dekiru contents haishin hoshiki no teian -", JOHO KAGAKU GIJUTSU FORUM 2002 (FIT2002), (20020913), vol. 4, pages 189 - 190, XP002979698 |