EP1633409 - IMPROVED CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BONE CEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortus Medical Limited; 74 Bath Green Longwell Green Bristol, BS30 9DG / GB | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRALET, Jake 304 Franklin Road Birmingham B30 1NE / GB | 02 /
GBURECK, Uwe Schiestlstrasse 2 97080 Wurzburg / DE | 03 /
THULL, Roger Wald kugelweg 23 97080 Wurzburg / DE | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Gaunt, Thomas Derrick, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Gaunt, Thomas Derrick, et al Ablett & Stebbing 101/103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/11] | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street, Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04733845.4 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004GB02179 | Priority number, date | GB20030011846 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0311846 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103419 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633409 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633409 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
A61L24/0063 (EP,US);
A61L27/425 (EP,US);
A61L2430/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE CALCIUM PHOSPHAT KNOCHENZEMENTE | [2006/11] | English: | IMPROVED CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BONE CEMENTS | [2006/11] | French: | CIMENTS DE PHOSPHATE DE CALCIUM AMELIORES POUR LES OS | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2011 | 31.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2004 | AT | 30.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | IT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | PL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | GB | 19.05.2012 | IE | 19.05.2012 | LU | 19.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
LU | 19.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6425949 (LEMAITRE JACQUES [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10-25,27-30 * column 3, line 27 - line 42 * * example 1 * * claim 8 *; | [X] - GBURECK U ET AL, "Surface properties of calcium phosphate particles for self setting bone cements", BIOMOLECULAR ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200208), vol. 19, no. 2-6, ISSN 1389-0344, pages 51 - 55, XP004378070 [X] 1,2,10-20,29,30 * the whole document * * page 51, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-0344(02)00010-2 | [X] - BOHNER M ET AL, "EFFECTS OF SULFATE, PYROPHOSPHATE, AND CITRATE IONS ON THE PHYSICOCHEMICAL PROPERTIES OF CEMENTS MADE OF BETA-TRICALCIUM PHOSPHATE-PHOSPHORIC ACID-WATER MIXTURES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19960601), vol. 79, no. 6, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 1427 - 1434, XP000596067 [X] 21-25,27,28 * figure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1151-2916.1996.tb08746.x | [X] - OTSUKA M ET AL, "PARTICLE SIZE EFFECT OF METASTABLE CALCIUM PHOSPHATES ON CRUSHING STRENGTH OF SELF-SETTING BIOACTIVE CALCIUM PHOSPHATE CEMENT", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO, JP, (19931101), vol. 41, no. 11, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 2055 - 2057, XP009001135 [X] 29 * figure 5; table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.820290105 | [PX] - GBURECK U ET AL, "Ionic modification of calcium phosphate cement viscosity. Part I: hypodermic injection and strength improvement of apatite cement", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20031106), vol. 25, no. 11, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 2187 - 2195, XP004485137 [PX] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2003.08.066 | [PX] - BARRALET J E ET AL, "Ionic modification of calcium phosphate cement viscosity. Part II: hypodermic injection and strength improvement of brushite cement", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20031119), vol. 25, no. 11, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 2197 - 2203, XP004485138 [PX] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2003.09.085 | [DA] - FERNANDEZ ENRIQUE ET AL, "Kinetic study of citric acid influence on calcium phosphate bone cements as water-reducing agent", J. BIOMED. MATER. RES.; JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH SEP 15 2002, (20020915), vol. 61, no. 4, pages 653 - 659, XP002301639 [DA] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 657, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.10264 | [A] - CHEN D, "[Physical properties of apatite bone cement]", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200003), Database accession no. NLM10879182, XP002301640 [A] 1-30 * abstract * | [ ] - SHENG WU YI XUE GONG CHENG XUE ZA ZHI = JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING = SHENGWU YIXUE GONGCHENGXUE ZAZHI. MAR 2000, (200003), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 1001-5515, pages 13 - 15 , 18 | [T] - CHEN D-M ET AL, "Study on the mechanical properties of hydroxyapatite bone cement", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2004), Database accession no. EMB-2004217475, XP002301641 [T] 1-30 * abstract * | [ ] - CHINESE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL REHABILITATION 2004 CHINA, (2004), vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 1671-5926, pages 1589 - 1591 | by applicant | - LEROUX L, "Effects of various adjuvants (lactic acid, glycerol and chitosan) on the injectability of a calcium phosphate cement", BONE, (1999), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S8756-3282(99)00130-1, pages 31 - 34, XP002461709 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S8756-3282(99)00130-1 | - GINEBRA MP, "Mechanical and rheological improvement of a calcium phosphate cement by the addition of a polymeric drug", J BIOMED MATER RES, (2001), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 113 - 118, XP001562267 | - SARDA S, "Kinetic effect of citric acid influence on calcium phosphate bone cements as water reducing agent", J BIOMED MATER RES, (2002), vol. 61, pages 652 - 659 | - VAN DER HOUWEN, JAM ET AL., "The application of calcium phosphate precipitation chemistry to phosphorous recovery: the influence of organic ligands", ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 22, pages 1325 - 1335 | - BOHNER ET AL., "Effects of sulfate, pyrophosphate, and citrate ions on the physicochemical properties of cements made of P tricalcium phosphate", J AM CERAM SOC, (1996), vol. 79, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1151-2916.1996.tb08746.x, pages 1427 - 34, XP000596067 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1151-2916.1996.tb08746.x | - GBURECK ET AL., "Surface properties of calcium phosphate particles for self setting bone cements", BIOMOLECULAR ENGINEERING, (2002), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/S1389-0344(02)00010-2, pages 51 - 55, XP004378070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-0344(02)00010-2 |