EP1637485 - INK-JET PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UWAGAKI, Hideo 1-37-2-401, Seikadai, Seika-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0238 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Shigeo 19-1-205, Kawarado-cho Nara-shi, Nara 630-8326 / JP | 03 /
TSUTSUI, Hiromitsu 3-356-5, Nishi.Nakayama-cho Nara-shi, Nara 631-0013 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Nobuyuki 2-2-24-105, Saikujo-cho Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 05 /
KAWAI, Ryoichi 6-2-2, Umamikita, Koryo-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 635-0831 / JP | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04733928.8 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004JP06742 | Priority number, date | JP20030144074 | 21.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003144074 | [2006/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004113209 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1637485 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/14, B41J11/00, B65H5/06, G03G15/00 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
B41J13/14 (EP,US);
B41J11/0065 (EP,US);
B41J13/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/12] | B65H5/06, G03G15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/35] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER | [2006/12] | English: | INK-JET PRINTER | [2006/12] | French: | IMPRIMANTE A JET D'ENCRE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2005 | Translation filed | 19.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 24.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/16] | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH336083 (SIEMAG FEINMECH WERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,3* figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP1043166 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,4; | [YA]EP1053883 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3 * paragraphs [0020] - [0026]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4 | International search | [A]JP2002154701 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2002326755 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH10310279 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |