EP1636587 - DIAGNOSING LIVER CIRRHOSIS USING AN ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR HUMAN PROTOONCOGENIC PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/12] | DIAGNOSTIC KIT FOR LIVER CIRRHOSIS COMPRISING AN ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR HUMAN PROTOONCOGENIC PROTEIN | ||
[2009/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Jin-Woo 118-804 Sin-Hyundai Apt., 434 Apgujeong-dong, Gang-nam-gu Seoul 135-976 / KR | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Habermann, Gert, et al Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Patentanwälte Montgelasstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Habermann, Gert, et al Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Patentanwälte Montgelasstrasse2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04734768.7 | 25.05.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004KR01242 | Priority number, date | KR20030033308 | 26.05.2003 Original published format: KR 2003033308 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004104598 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1636587 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1636587 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C12P21/02, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, A61K31/404 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
B23K26/035 (KR);
B23K26/22 (KR);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
G01N2800/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE VON LEBERZIRRHOSE MITTELS EINES FÜR MENSCHLICHES PROTOONKOGENES PROTEIN SPEZIFISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERS | [2009/49] | English: | DIAGNOSING LIVER CIRRHOSIS USING AN ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR HUMAN PROTOONCOGENIC PROTEIN | [2009/49] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC DE LA CIRRHOSE DU FOIE UTILSANT UN ANTICORPS SPECIFIQUE D'UNE PROTEINE PROTO-ONCOGENE HUMAINE | [2009/49] |
Former [2006/12] | EINEN FÜR MENSCHLICHES PROTOONKOGENES PROTEIN SPEZIFISCHEN ANTIKÖRPER ENTHALTENDER DIAGNOSTISCHER KIT FÜR LEBERZIRRHOSE | ||
Former [2006/12] | DIAGNOSTIC KIT FOR LIVER CIRRHOSIS COMPRISING AN ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR HUMAN PROTOONCOGENIC PROTEIN | ||
Former [2006/12] | TROUSSE DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR LA CIRRHOSE DU FOIE COMPRENANT UN ANTICORPS SPECIFIQUE D'UNE PROTEINE PROTO-ONCOGENE HUMAINE | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.11.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | IE | 25.05.2010 | LU | 25.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | HU | 29.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.05.2010 | ||
LU | 25.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.05.2010 | ||
LU | 25.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 28.04.2010 | |
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO0244370 (KIM JIN WOO [KR]) [XD] 1-14 * page 8, line 24 - line 36 * * examples 8-10 * * claims 3,9 *; | [X] - YOON SEUNG-KEW ET AL, "Development of a new tumor marker against human hepatocellular carcinoma", HEPATOLOGY, & 53RD ANNUAL MEETING ON THE LIVER; BOSTON, MA, USA; NOVEMBER 01-05, 2002, (200210), vol. 36, no. 4 Part 2, ISSN 0270-9139, page 302A, XP009066894 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6265161 (DEJEAN ANNE [FR], et al); | [X]KR20020041550 (KIM JIN WOO [KR]); | [A] - LACOVAZZI P.A. ET AL., "Serum 90K/MAC-2PB Glycoprotein in Patients with Liver Cirrhosis and Hepatocellular Carcino: a Comparison with alpha-Fetoprotein", CLIN. CHEM. LAB. MED., (200110), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 961 - 965, XP003000888 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/CCLM.2001.155 | [A] - RAEDELE J. ET AL., "Alpha-Fetoprotein and p53 Autoantibodies in Patients with Chronic Hepatitus C", DIG. DIS. SCI., (199512), vol. 40, no. 12, pages 2587 - 2594, XP003000847 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02220446 | [XP] - KO J. ET AL., ONCOGENE, KOREA, (20030724), vol. 22, no. 30, pages 4679 - 4689, XP002332525 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1206624 | [T] - YOON S.K. ET AL., "The human cervical cancer oncogene protein is a biomarker for human hepatocellular carcinoma", CANCER RES., KOREA, (20040801), vol. 64, no. 15, pages 5434 - 5441, XP002332526 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-03-3665 |