EP1628859 - BELT BUCKLING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEIPER GmbH & Co. KG Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIPPEL, Daniel Erfurter Strasse 9 67722 Winnweiler / DE | 02 /
KÖNIG, Michael Bahnhofstr. 24 67688 Rodenbach / DE | 03 /
REISCHMANN, Martin Friedhofstr. 1 66989 Hoehfroeschen / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Henning In den Steinwiesen 9 67752 Wolfstein / DE | 05 /
EDRICH, Hans Johanniskreuzer Strasse 13 67716 Heltersberg / DE | 06 /
DIEHL, Andreas In der Zeil 20 67731 Otterbach / DE | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04734819.8 | 26.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004EP05632 | Priority number, date | DE2003125473 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325473 | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108487 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1628859 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1628859 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/20, B60R22/195, B60R22/03 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B60R22/03 (EP,US);
B60R22/1952 (EP,US);
B60R2022/1806 (EP,US);
B60R22/1951 (EP,US);
B60R22/1955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/37] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GURTSCHLOSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2006/09] | English: | BELT BUCKLING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE SEAT | [2006/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE DE CEINTURE DE SECURITE POUR UN SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 08.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3044834 (ERNST HANS HELLMUT ING GRAD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19941435 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002167212 (ROGERS LLOYD WALKER [US], et al); | [A]US2003075914 (KOHLNDORFER KENNETH H [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W * |