EP1639661 - A POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR FOR A MANGANESE DRY BATTERY AND A MANGANESE DRY BATTERY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Hajime 3-3, Ebisucho, Kishiwada-shi Osaka 596-0022 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Hajime -- -- / JP | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04734935.2 | 26.05.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004JP07585 | Priority number, date | JP20030192170 | 04.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003192170 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005004254 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1639661 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M4/75, H01M6/06 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H01M4/666 (EP,US);
H01M4/663 (EP,US);
H01M4/668 (EP,US);
H01M50/179 (EP,US);
H01M50/184 (EP,US);
H01M50/186 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODEN-STROMSAMMLER FÜR EINE MANGAN-TROCKENBATTERIE UND DIESEN VERWENDENDE MANGAN-TROCKENBATTERIE | [2006/13] | English: | A POSITIVE ELECTRODE CURRENT COLLECTOR FOR A MANGANESE DRY BATTERY AND A MANGANESE DRY BATTERY USING THE SAME | [2006/13] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT A ELECTRODE POSITIVE POUR UNE PILE SECHE AU MANGANESE ET PILE SECHE AU MANGANESES UTILISANT LEDIT COLLECTEUR | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]JPH03297063 ; | [Y]JPS63168968 ; | [Y]JPH06176763 ; | [Y]JPH07272702 ; | [Y]JPH09237616 ; | [Y]US3179537 (REILLY THOMAS A) [Y] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]US3891463 (KAROBATH ERNST, et al) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4806441 (BREZILLON JEAN L [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO03083962 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-5 * the whole document * | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920407), vol. 0161, no. 38, Database accession no. (E - 1186), & JP03297063 A 19911227 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [YD] 1-5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881116), vol. 0124, no. 35, Database accession no. (E - 683), & JP63168968 A 19880712 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940921), vol. 0185, no. 04, Database accession no. (E - 1608), & JP06176763 A 19940624 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07272702 A 19951020 (FUJI ELELCTROCHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09237616 A 19970909 (TOSHIBA BATTERY CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * |