EP1629276 - DETERMINATION OF CONTAMINANT PARTICLES IN AN AQUEOUS PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FPInnovations 570 Boul. St-Jean Pointe-Claire QC N9R 3L9 / CA | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Pulp and Paper Research Institute of Canada 570 St. John's Boulevard Pointe-Claire Quebec H9R 3J9 / CA | ||
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Pulp and Paper Research Institute of Canada 570 St. John's Boulevard Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 3J9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, John, David 8551 Wilderness Court Burnaby, British Columbia V5A 4B2 / CA | 02 /
OLSON, James, Allen 5003 Linden Drive Delta, British Columbia V4K 3A2 / CA | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 04735183.8 | 28.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004CA00805 | Priority number, date | US20030475475P | 04.06.2003 Original published format: US 475475 P | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109276 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629276 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1629276 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/34, D21B1/02, D21D5/02 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
D21D5/026 (EP,US);
G01N33/343 (EP,US);
Y10S209/915 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON STÖRPARTIKELN IN EINER WÄSSRIGEN ZELLSTOFFSUSPENSION | [2006/09] | English: | DETERMINATION OF CONTAMINANT PARTICLES IN AN AQUEOUS PULP | [2006/09] | French: | DETERMINATION DES PARTICULES DE CONTAMINANTS DANS UNE PATE AQUEUSE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 31.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.04.2007 | CH | 11.04.2007 | CY | 11.04.2007 | CZ | 11.04.2007 | DK | 11.04.2007 | EE | 11.04.2007 | IT | 11.04.2007 | LI | 11.04.2007 | NL | 11.04.2007 | PL | 11.04.2007 | RO | 11.04.2007 | SI | 11.04.2007 | SK | 11.04.2007 | TR | 11.04.2007 | IE | 28.05.2007 | LU | 28.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | BG | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.07.2007 | ES | 22.07.2007 | PT | 11.09.2007 | HU | 12.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
LU | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
HU | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
IT | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 11.04.2007 | |
CH | 11.04.2007 | ||
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | CH | 11.04.2007 | |
LI | 11.04.2007 | ||
PL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
ES | 22.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 11.04.2007 | |
ES | 22.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]US5542542 (HOFFMANN JOHN D [CA], et al) [DX] 1-4,9-14,16,17 * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 15; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-7; | [DY]US5624558 (AALTONEN FRANK [NL], et al) [DY] 5-7 * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 10; figure 1 *; | [X] - GOODING ROBERT W ET AL, "Paprispec: a system for monitoring plastic contaminants in pulp", TAPPI J; TAPPI JOURNAL JUN 1997 TAPPI PRESS, NORCROSS, GA, USA, (199706), vol. 80, no. 6, pages 191 - 196, XP008034232 [X] 1-4 * page 194, column M, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2 * | [A] - FRIESEN TIMOTHY ET AL, "Pressure screen system simulation for optimal fractionation", ANNU MEET TECH SECT CAN PULP PAP ASSOC PREPR; ANNUAL MEETING - TECHNICAL SECTION, CANADIAN PULP AND PAPER ASSOCIATION, PREPRINTS 2002, (2002), vol. C, pages C33 - C38, XP002293104 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - SITHOLE BRUCE ET AL, "Determination and classification of contaminants in recycled pulps by screening techniques", PROGR PAP RECYCL; PROGRESS IN PAPER RECYCLING NOV 1998 PROG PAP RECYCL, APPLETON, WI, USA, (199811), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 34 - 43, XP008034252 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - ROBITAILLE M A, "PLASTIC CONTAMINATION IN THE PULP MILL: AN OVERVIEW", PULP PAP CAN JAN 1988, (198801), vol. 89, no. 1, pages 121 - 125, XP008034251 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |