EP1639219 - HINGE FOR DOORS AND WINDOWS, ESPECIALLY FOOD INDUSTRY SWINGING DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Szörényi, Csaba Máriavölgy utca 9 2040 Budaors / HU | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Kovari, György Advopatent Office of Patent and Trademark Attorneys Fö u. 19 1011 Budapest / HU | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Kovari, György Advopatent, Office of Patent and Trademark Attorneys, Fö u. 19 1011 Budapest / HU | Application number, filing date | 04735276.0 | 28.05.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004HU00057 | Priority number, date | HU20030001529 | 02.06.2003 Original published format: HU 0301529 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004106677 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639219 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639219 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05D3/02, E05D3/08 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
E05D3/022 (EP);
E05D15/54 (EP);
E05D11/1064 (EP);
E05F1/1253 (EP);
E05Y2900/11 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIER FÜR TÜREN UND FENSTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR PENDELTÜREN DER LEBENSMITTELINDUSTRIE | [2006/13] | English: | HINGE FOR DOORS AND WINDOWS, ESPECIALLY FOOD INDUSTRY SWINGING DOORS | [2006/13] | French: | CHARNIERE POUR PORTES ET FENETRES, EN PARTICULIER POUR DES PORTES BATTANTES DANS LES INDUSTRIES ALIMENTAIRES | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | IE | 28.05.2010 | LU | 28.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | FR | 05.07.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GB | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | DE | 01.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
LU | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 05.07.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
LU | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 05.07.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 05.07.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 05.07.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 05.07.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
DE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 05.05.2010 | |
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB804584 (WALTER ROWLEY LTD) [X] 1,2,4-8* page 1, line 38 - page 2, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [X]SE205661 (HERMANSSON) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 1, column 2, line 30 - page 2, column 1, line 20 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US3444444 |