EP1633213 - A VARIABLE RESISTANCE CORD CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARMAROPOULOS, George P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | 02 /
VU, Giang P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04735637.3 | 01.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004IB50817 | Priority number, date | US20030475707P | 04.06.2003 Original published format: US 475707 P | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004107887 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633213 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A41D1/00, G01D5/165 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
A41D1/005 (EP,US);
H01R29/00 (KR);
A41D1/00 (KR);
G01D5/165 (KR);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06F1/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNURVERBINDER MIT VARIABLEM WIDERSTAND | [2006/11] | English: | A VARIABLE RESISTANCE CORD CONNECTOR | [2006/11] | French: | RACCORD POUR CORDONS A RESISTANCE VARIABLE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 25.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6535102 (MARMAROPOULOS GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,12 * column 2, line 21 - line 32; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 4,5,9,10; | [PY]WO2004002249 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PY] 4,5,9,10 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6360615 (SMELA ELISABETH [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6563424 (KAARIO JUHA [FI]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0046]; figure 10 *; | [A]WO03014684 (UNIV WOLLONGONG [AU], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 9 * * page 6, line 12 - line 14; figure 1 * |