EP1555742 - DC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANKEN ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-3, 3-chome, Kitano Niiza-shi Saitama 352-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Sanken Electric Co., Ltd. 6-3, 3-chome, Kitano Niiza-shi, Saitama 352-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASO, Shinji, c/o Sanken Electric Co., Ltd. 6-3, Kitano 3-chome, Niiza-shi Saitama 352-8666 / JP | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04735678.7 | 01.06.2004 | [2005/29] | WO2004JP07903 | Priority number, date | JP20030197699 | 16.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003197699 | [2005/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005008871 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555742 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/28 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
H02M1/34 (EP,US);
H02M3/33507 (EP,US);
H02M3/33571 (EP,US);
H02M1/342 (EP,US);
H02M3/01 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/43] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROMWANDLER | [2005/29] | English: | DC CONVERTER | [2005/29] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE COURANT CONTINU | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2005 | Translation filed | 06.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5126931 (JITARU IONEL [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * column A * * figures 1,6,9,10 * * column 2, line 65 - line 68 * * column 3, line 39 - line 42 * * column 4, line 5 - line 34 * * column 5, line 56 - line 59 * * column 6, line 18 - line 22 * * column 10, line 22 - line 25 * * column 12, line 46 - column 13, line 6 *; | [A]US5570278 (CROSS DAVID A [HK]) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 1,2 * * column 9, line 40 - line 58 *; | [A]US5745358 (FAULK RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1,2 * column A * * figure 2 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 3 *; | [YA]JP2000092829 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 1 * column W * [A] 2; | [XY]US6404654 (WANG JOHNSON [CN]) [X] 2,5 * column A * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 1 - line 22 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 26 * [Y] 1; | [PX]US2004080969 (FRANCK FELIX [DE]) [PX] 2,5 * column A * * figures 4,6 ** paragraphs [0026] , [0040] , [0053] * | International search | [A]JPH09182429 (ORIGIN ELECTRIC); | [A]JP2000092829 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2002199719 (DENSEI LAMBDA KK); | [A]JP2002345240 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) |