EP1640208 - CONSTRUCTION IMPROVEMENTS TO BE IMPLEMENTED DURING THE CUSTOMISATION, TRANSFORMATION OR CONVERSION OF VEHICLES, IN ORDER TO PROVIDE ACCESS FOR AND TO ENABLE THE TRANSPORT OF DISABLED AND/OR WHEELCHAIR-BOUND PERSONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARADAP, S.L. Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 320 08004 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states CARADAP, S.L. Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 320 E-08004 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA NAVARRO, Sebastián c/o CARADAP, S.L. Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 320 E-08004 Barcelona / ES | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/31] | 01 /
GARCIA NAVARRO, Sebastián c/o CARADAP, S.L. Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 320 E-08004 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
GARCIA NAVARRO, Sebastián Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 320 E-08004 Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/13] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 04735746.2 | 02.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004ES00250 | Priority number, date | ES20030001328 | 04.06.2003 Original published format: ES 200301328 | [2006/13] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108475 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640208 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/43, A61G3/06 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A61G3/065 (EP);
A61G3/061 (EP,ES);
A61G3/067 (EP);
B60P1/431 (ES);
B60P1/4428 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄHREND DER KUNDENSPEZIFISCHEN ANPASSUNG, UMWANDLUNG ODER UMRÜSTUNG VON FAHRZEUGEN DURCHZUFÜHRENDE KONSTRUKTIONSVERBESSERUNGEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ZUGANG FÜR BEHINDERTE UND/ODER ROLLSTUHLGEBUNDENE PERSONEN UND ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG IHRES TRANSPORTS | [2006/13] | English: | CONSTRUCTION IMPROVEMENTS TO BE IMPLEMENTED DURING THE CUSTOMISATION, TRANSFORMATION OR CONVERSION OF VEHICLES, IN ORDER TO PROVIDE ACCESS FOR AND TO ENABLE THE TRANSPORT OF DISABLED AND/OR WHEELCHAIR-BOUND PERSONS | [2006/13] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTES A LA CONSTRUCTION D'ADAPTATIONS, DE TRANSFORMATIONS OU DE CONVERSIONS DE VEHICULES POUR PERMETTRE A DES PERSONNES INVALIDES ET/OU EN CHAISE ROULANTE D'ACCEDER A CES VEHICULES ET D'Y ETRE TRANSPORTES | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2006 | Translation filed | 04.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | 18.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]NL7603820 (ADRIANUS PETRUS CHRISTINA SMUL); | [A]US4534450 (SAVARIA PIERRE [CA]); | [A]DE29914122U (IBEG MASCH & GERAETEBAU [DE]); | [A]FR2817516 (O M A R S SPA [IT]); | [A]US2002076313 (VARTANIAN ROGER [US]) |