EP1631821 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYSING A BIOLOGICAL LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVMD UK LIMITED The Green House Beechwood Business Park North Inverness IV2 3BL / GB | For all designated states Inverness Medical Switzerland GmbH Bundesplatz 1 6300 Zug / CH | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states IVMD UK LIMITED The Green House Beechwood Business Park North Inverness IV2 3BL / GB | ||
For all designated states UNIPATH LIMITED Priory Business Park Bedford, MK44 3UP / GB | |||
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Hall Effect Technologies Ltd The Green House, Beechwood Business Park North Inverness IV2 3BL / GB | ||
For all designated states UNIPATH LIMITED Priory Business Park Bedford, MK44 3UP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLER, Jonathan Andrew The Green House, Beechwood Business Park North Inverness IV2 3BL / GB | 02 /
DJENNATI, Nasr-Eddine The Green House, Beechwood Business Park North Inverness IV2 3BL / GB | 03 /
PORTER, Robert Priory Business Park Bedford MK44 3UP / GB | 04 /
SCOTT, David Priory Business Park Bedford MK44 3UP / GB | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/10] | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor GB-Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04736085.4 | 04.06.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004GB02401 | Priority number, date | GB20030013015 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: GB 0313015 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109277 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631821 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/4905 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHEN EINER BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2006/10] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYSING A BIOLOGICAL LIQUID | [2006/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'UN ANALYSE D'UN LIQUIDE | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 02.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/31] | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 15   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 16   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 17   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2021 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 26.09.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/08] | 01.06.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/47] | 26.09.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2020/47] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0400847 (FISONS PLC [GB]) [X] 44-46 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 6 *; | [A]US5841023 (PARKER JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 7 *; | [X]US6136271 (LORINCZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-14,16,17,19-32,34-43 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6165795 (MIZE PATRICK D [US], et al) [A] 1-46* column 6, line 24 - line 43 *; | [XA] - PUCKETT L G ET AL, "Monitoring blood coagulation with magnetoelastic sensors", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS ELSEVIER UK, (200303), vol. 18, no. 5-6, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 675 - 681, XP002295883 [X] 39-43 * page 675, column L, line 1 - column R, line 4; figure 1 * [A] 1,14,44-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(03)00033-2 |