EP1755316 - MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKODATE, Shinya, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TOYAMA, Naoki, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
TOMIMORI, Takeshi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04736349.4 | 08.06.2004 | [2007/08] | WO2004JP08276 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005122536 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755316 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, G09G3/32, // H04M19/04, H04M1/725, H04M1/23 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H04M1/22 (EP,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04M1/021 (EP,US);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US);
H04M1/0266 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | H04M1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/37] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG | [2007/08] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE | [2007/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2006 | Translation filed | 11.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 13.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6177877 (MUNYON TIMOTHY [US]) [X] 1,21,25 * abstract * * figures 3,5,8 * * column 4, line 65 * * column 5, lines 8,21-30,53-55 * * column 7, lines 20-34 *; | [X]US2002191102 (YUYAMA MASAMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * abstract * * figure 14 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0068] , [0110] - [0117] - [0137] - [0143] *; | [X]GB2393548 (PATE ANDREW CLIFFORD [GB]) [X] 1,21,25 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * pages 1,2 ** claims 1,2,7,10,11 * | International search | [Y]JPH06175591 (SEIWA ELECTRIC MFG); | [X]JPH0739075U ; | [Y]JPH08125231 (HARRISON ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH1063227 (MOTOROLA INC); | [X]JPH10228250 (IKEUCHI KK); | [X]JP3068833U ; | [X]JP2001143501 (TOKAI RYOKAKU TETSUDO KK); | [A]JP2002169198 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JP2003218990 (NEC SAITAMA LTD); | [A]JP2003219062 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2003259182 (NIDEC COPAL CORP); | [A]JP2004080390 (SONY CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2004088316 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004159363 (SHARP KK) |