EP1633602 - ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ACTUATING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metagal Industria e Comercio Ltda Rodovia BR 459, km 121, no.333, Distrito Industrial Santa Rita do Sapucai Estado de Minas Gerais CEP 37540-000 / BR | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SESTOKAS, Affonso, Roberto Rua Borges Lagoa, 71 - Apto 64 CEP-04038-030 S o Paulo - Estado de S o / BR | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04736374.2 | 09.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004BR00088 | Priority number, date | BR3000973U | 16.06.2003 Original published format: BR 3000973 U | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110818 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633602 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633602 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/07, B60R1/072 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B60R1/07 (EP,KR,US);
B60R1/072 (EP,KR,US);
B60R16/023 (KR);
B60R2011/004 (KR);
B60R2011/005 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/38] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN BETÄTIGUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2006/11] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR AN ACTUATING MECHANISM | [2006/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A UN MECANISME D'ACTIONNEMENT | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 29.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0395052 (MAGNA AUTECA AUTOZUBEHOER [AT]); | [A]DE2840789 (WEISS PAUL FA); | [A]DE2461431 (MAERKLIN & CIE GMBH GEB) |