EP1633511 - CASTING ROBOT COMPRISING A WEIGHING CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, LU | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Künkel-Wagner SLS Swisspour AG Gisleren 2 CH-3266 Wiler bei Seedorf / CH | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUPER, Fritz Kosthofenstrasse 2 CH-3266 Wiler bei Seedorf / CH | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 Postfach 8501 Frauenfeld 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 04736493.0 | 10.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004CH00351 | Priority number, date | CH104003 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: CH 104003 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110683 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633511 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633511 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B22D39/04 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
B22D39/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GIESSROBOTER MIT EINER WÄGEZELLE | [2006/11] | English: | CASTING ROBOT COMPRISING A WEIGHING CELL | [2006/11] | French: | ROBOT DE COULEE COMPORTANT UNE CELLULE DE PESEE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 28.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2007
31.05.2007
ADMISSIBLE SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 28-12, Meieki 3-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 450-0002 / JP Opponent's representative Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2007
31.05.2007
ADMISSIBLE SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 28-12, Meieki 3-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 450-0002 / JP Opponent's representative Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | 29.06.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.11.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.08.2006 | CZ | 23.08.2006 | EE | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IE | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | RO | 23.08.2006 | SI | 23.08.2006 | SK | 23.08.2006 | BG | 23.11.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | HU | 24.02.2007 | AT | 10.06.2007 | LU | 10.06.2007 | BE | 30.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/41] |
Former [2008/41] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
AT | 10.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
AT | 10.06.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09277025 ; | [DA]DE4028918 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 59 * * column 3, line 38 - line 56 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]WO9900205 (LAUPER FRITZ [CH]) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3 - page 4 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [PA]DE10312423 (MICHALAK EUGEN [DE], et al) [PA] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09277025 A 19971028 (KOMUTAAZU KK; NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |