EP1651952 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SENSING USING DIAMOND BASED MICROELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
DE
DK
ES
IE
IT
PL
RO
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | For:AT
CZ
DE
DK
ES
FR
IE
IT
PL
RO
SK
TR
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:TR
Schlumberger Oilfield Assistance Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For:AT
DE
DK
ES
IE
IT
PL
RO
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | ||
For:AT
CZ
DE
DK
ES
FR
IE
IT
PL
RO
SK
TR
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | |||
For:TR
Schlumberger Oilfield Assistance Limited Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:FR
Services Petroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Li 8 Cook Close Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | 02 /
JONES, Timothy, Gareth, John 16 Denmark Road Cottenham, Cambridgeshire CB4 8QS / GB | 03 /
HALL, Clive, Edward Staringstraat 1b NL-6511 PC Nijmegen / NL | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | Mirza, Akram Karim Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited , High Cross, Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 OEL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04736520.0 | 10.06.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004GB02456 | Priority number, date | GB20030018135 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: GB 0318135 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017514 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651952 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/403, G01N27/416, G01N27/48, G01N27/49, G01N27/30, E21B49/10 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
G01N27/403 (EP,US);
E21B49/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM FÜHLEN MIT DIAMANTGESTÜTZTEN MIKROELEKTRODEN | [2006/18] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SENSING USING DIAMOND BASED MICROELECTRODES | [2006/18] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION FAISANT INTERVENIR DES MICROELECTRODES A BASE DE DIAMANT | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5656827 (KANG WENG POO [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 55 * * column 10, line 7 - line 20; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1156136 (UNIV TOKYO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0188522 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B V ST [NL], et al) [A] 1,26,27,29-38 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003134426 (JIANG LI [GB], et al) [A] 25* paragraph [0091] *; | [DPA]GB2391314 (SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS [VG]) [DPA] 29-38 * the whole document *; | [A] - MADORE C, DURET A, HAENNI W AND PERRET A, "Detection of trace silver and copper at an array of boron-doped microdisk electrodes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON MICROFABRICATED SYSTEMS AND MEMS, PENNINGTON, NJ, (20001027), vol. 2000-19, page 159, XP002306592 [A] 1 * page 160 - page 161; figure 1 * | [A] - SOH K L ET AL, "CVD diamond anisotropic film as electrode for electrochemical sensing", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20030601), vol. 91, no. 1-3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 39 - 45, XP004424393 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(03)00064-9 | [A] - JEROSCHEWSKI P ET AL, "GALVANIC SENSOR FOR DETERMINATION OF HYDROGEN SULFIDE", ELECTROANALYSIS, VHC PUBLISHERS, INC, US, (199409), vol. 6, no. 9, ISSN 1040-0397, pages 769 - 772, XP001023470 [A] 24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elan.1140060910 | by applicant | US5071527 | - PITTER ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (1996), vol. 69, page 4035 | - KUO ET AL., ELECTROCHEM. & SOLID-STATE LETT., (1999), vol. 2, page 288 | - OJANI ET AL., IRAN. J. CHEM. &.CHEM. ENG., (2001), vol. 20, page 75 | - DOWNARD, ELECTROANALYSIS, (2000), vol. 12, page 1085 |