EP1635661 - PRODUCT FOR ABSORPTION PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WADSTRÖM, Torkel Rektorsvägen 7 S-224 67 Lund / SE | For all designated states Ljung, Asa Rektorsvägen 7 224 67 Lund / SE | For all designated states Hjertén, Stellan Langvägen 7 B S-752 52 Uppsala / SE | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADSTRÖM, Torkel Rektorsvägen 7 224 67 Lund / SE | 02 /
LJUNG, Asa Rektorsvägen 7 224 67 Lund / SE | 03 /
HJERTEN, Stellan Långvägen 7B 756 52 Uppsala / SE | 04 /
ILBÄCK, Nils-Gunnar Wallingatan 17E 752 27 Uppsala / SE | 05 /
HJERTEN, Marie-Christine Lidnersgatan 40, 1 tr 754 42 Uppsala / SE | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
WADSTRÖM, Torkel Rektorsvägen 7 224 67 Lund / SE | ||
02 /
LJUNG, Asa Rektorsvägen 7 224 67 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
HJERTEN, Stellan Langvägen 7B 762 52 Uppsala / SE | |||
04 /
ILBÄCK, Nils-Gunnar Wallingatan 17E 752 27 Uppsala / SE | |||
05 /
HJERTEN, Marie-Christine Lidnersgatan 40, 1 tr 754 42 Uppsala / SE | |||
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
WADSTRÖM, Torkel Rektorsvägen 7 224 67 Lund / SE | ||
02 /
LJUNG, Asa Rektorsvägen 7 224 67 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
HJERTEN, Stellan Langvägen 7B 762 52 Uppsala / SE | |||
04 /
ILBÄCK, Nils-Gunnar Wallingatan 17E 752 27 Uppsala / SE | Representative(s) | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari, et al Zacco Sweden AB Patent Department P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari, et al Zacco Sweden AB, Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04736720.6 | 11.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004SE00928 | Priority number, date | US20030477960P | 13.06.2003 Original published format: US 477960 P | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110193 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635661 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1635661 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/11, B01D39/14, A62B7/10, B01D71/00, B01D39/16 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
A41D13/11 (EP,US);
A61F13/00063 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61L15/42 (EP,US);
A61L2/02 (EP,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61L9/16 (EP,US);
B01D39/1615 (EP,US);
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D39/18 (EP,US);
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/262 (EP,US);
B01J20/265 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
B01J20/321 (EP,US);
B01J20/3212 (EP,US);
B01J20/3217 (EP,US);
B01J20/3251 (EP,US);
B01J20/3272 (EP,US);
B65D65/00 (EP,US);
B65D81/3415 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00297 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00319 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00748 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0091 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0442 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKT FÜR ABSORPTIONSZWECKE | [2006/12] | English: | PRODUCT FOR ABSORPTION PURPOSES | [2006/12] | French: | PRODUIT DESTINE A L'ABSORPTION | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Request for further processing for: | 28.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.08.2010 | BG | 11.11.2010 | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/12] | BG | 11.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004204401 ; | [X]EP0433661 (PALL CORP [US]); | [X]WO9400166 (US HEALTH [US]); | [X]EP1064979 (GLEHN & CO AB [SE]); | [X]US2001034055 (LEE WILLIAM [US], et al); | [XP]US2003168401 (KOSLOW EVAN E [US]); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, no. 200452, Database accession no. 2004-538059, XP002981458 & JP2004204401 A 20040722 (EBARA CORP) | Examination | US4411795 | WO0108792 | WO03033053 | WO03064330 | EP1444996 | EP1470083 | by applicant | WO0108792 |